judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TIMOTHY CATLETT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0672
Short Caption:TIMOTHY CATLETT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8617-84Filed Date:06/04/1987

Opening Event Date:06/04/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/07/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTimothy Catlett N
Frederick J. Sullivan NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CATLETT, TIMOTHY UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: LEVY ROUSE, RUSSELL NOTE - 01 OVERTON, CHARLES TURNER, NOTE - 02 CHRISTOPHER TURNER, STEVEN NOTE - 02 WEBB, KELVIN SMITH & NOTE - 03 CLIFTON YARBOROUGH NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 092487 ORDER: COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 04 IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DOCKETING NOTE - 05 STATE OR HIS APPOINTMENT WILL NOTE - 05 BE VACATED & THIS MATTER REF NOTE - 06 TO THE BPR. NOTE - 06
06/04/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) FREDERICK J. SULLIVAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD CHECK
08/07/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD R
09/04/1987ORDER APLT DOCKETING STATE DUE W/IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD DSA
09/24/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 03. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 091487 SCHPRD DSA
09/29/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD DSA
12/16/1987ORDER APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 100787 SCHPRD CHECK
02/26/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FILE BRIEF IN 10 DAYS OR VACATE APPNTMNT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 012588 SCHPRD BA
03/11/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
03/17/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO DISMISS & CASE DISMISSED. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 031588 SCHPRD Q
03/17/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
04/07/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD