judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERIC BROOKS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1140
Short Caption:ERIC BROOKS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4160-87Filed Date:08/24/1988

Opening Event Date:08/24/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/17/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/30/1989
Argued/Submitted:01/04/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/29/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEric Brooks N
Edward D. Joseph YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Diane M. Munson YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BROOKS, ERIC UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CO-DEFENDANTS:JAMES M. JACKSON NOTE - 01 , CERETA B. JACKSON, NOTE - 02 AND VERNARD J. MATHIS NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 3/21/90 ORD: THAT THIS COURT'S NOTE - 03 MOJ DTD 1/12/90 IS AMENDED TO NOTE - 04 REFLECT THAT APLT'S CONVICTION NOTE - 04 IN COUNT 10 OF THE INDICTMENT, NOTE - 05 POSSESSION OF UNREGISTERED NOTE - 05 FIREARM, D.C. CODE SECTION NOTE - 06 6-2311 (A) (1981), IS HEREBY NOTE - 06 VACATED.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/01/04 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - JOSEPHE FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - MUNSOND FOR - APPELLEE
08/24/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/16/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) EDWARD D. JOSEPH, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/30/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLR PANEL SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD DSA
12/08/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 102388 SCHPRD R
01/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(249 PGS/TREMEL) AD PANEL SCDATE 010289 SCHPRD RT
03/17/1989FiledRecord Completed
03/17/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (114 PGS RT - GLEASON) GT PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
03/23/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD BA
04/12/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR ONLY TO EXTENT THAT BR IS DUE IN 30 DAYS. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD M
05/12/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAYS TO JUNE 12TH JB PANEL SCDATE 051289 SCHPRD BA
05/25/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/09/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/09/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM & BRF OF APLT IS FL; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 052489 SCHPRD OPE
07/10/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 10TH (NO OPA) JB PANEL SCDATE 071089 SCHPRD BE
07/17/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/10/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 071289 SCHPRD X
08/10/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8-24-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 081089 SCHPRD BE
08/24/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AND APPENDIX AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/30/1989FiledBriefing Completed
08/30/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 082989 SCHPRD M
09/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF APLT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 101089 SCHPRD M
01/04/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/04/1990ARGUED PANELNWTEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/12/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELNWTEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/12/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/18/1990APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 3 THRU 6 SL PANELNWTEPY SCDATE 012590 SCHPRD VS
03/29/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD