judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GARY R. HOLBROOK V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0762
Short Caption:GARY R. HOLBROOK V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1388-86Filed Date:06/26/1987

Opening Event Date:06/26/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/11/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/14/1988
Argued/Submitted:03/02/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/28/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGary R. Holbrook N
Anthony L. Stewart YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Saul M. PilchenYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HOLBROOK, GARY R. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: ZOLA M. GARRIS AKA NOTE - 01 ZOLA M. STARR
01/01/1904JUDGE - SW AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
06/26/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ANTHONY L. STEWART, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 073087 SCHPRD CHECK
08/10/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD DSA
08/21/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PM PANEL SCDATE 082587 SCHPRD R
01/25/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (143 PGS - HART) JB PANEL SCDATE 010488 SCHPRD RT
05/11/1988FiledRecord Completed
05/11/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (148 PGS - SHELTON) JB PANEL SCDATE 041588 SCHPRD RT
06/17/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 20TH (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 062088 SCHPRD BA
08/01/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF LATE (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 072088 SCHPRD BA
08/01/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT & CLK TO FL BRF OF APLT; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 080388 SCHPRD V
09/14/1988FiledBriefing Completed
09/14/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 091688 SCHPRD BE
03/02/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/02/1989SUBMITTED PANELMKBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/03/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELMKBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/03/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/28/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD