Case Information: 40960 | |||
Short Caption: | SHRECKENGAUST (MARK) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 46702 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR021804 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/19/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/19/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 03-02791 | |
02/19/2003 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: November 25, 2002 and November 26, 2002. Court Reporter: I. Zihn. Filed in district court on: February 14, 2003. | 03-02792 | |
03/04/2003 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: November 25-26, 2002. Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. | 03-03546 | |
04/02/2003 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: April 7, 2003. | 03-05496 | |
04/07/2003 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for this Court to take Judicial Notice of the Records of Case Number CR96-2148 from the Second Judicial District Court as reflected in the file kept in the Regular Course of Business by that Court. | 03-05783 | |
04/07/2003 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 03-05784 | |
04/07/2003 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 03-05785 | |
04/07/2003 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to file Supplemental Appendix. | 03-05786 | |
04/29/2003 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 03-07271 | |
05/08/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has moved this court to take judicial notice of prior criminal records in which appellant was previously convicted of felony DUI and for permission to file a supplemental appendix containing those documents. The motions are granted. The clerk of this court shall file the supplemental appendix submitted by appellant. fn1[Although this court may take judicial notice of appropriate court records, it does no appear that the supplemental records appellant has provided are part of the record made and considered in the court below in the instatet case. Whether this court may appropriately consider the documents in resolving appellant's specific contentions in this appeal is an issue presented by the briefs. This court may ultimately conclude that consideration of the records appellant has submitted is not warranted.] | 03-07824 | |
05/08/2003 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Supplemental Appendix. | 03-05788 | |
07/02/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn4[We need not address the arguments made by the parties involving the validity of the felony enhancement of the 1996 conviction.] NNP03-RR/WM/MG | 03-11091 | |
07/29/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 03-11178 | |
07/29/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/14/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 1, 2003. | 03-11178 |