Case Information: 40956 | |||
Short Caption: | ESPARZA (JESSE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C187406 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 10/23/2003 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/18/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/18/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 03-02728 | |
02/26/2003 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 12/04/02, 12/16/02, 01/16/03, 01/27/03. Court Reporter: Margaret Isom. Filed in district court on: 02/24/03. | 03-03155 | |
03/31/2003 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 03-05316 | |
04/04/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Full Briefing. and Denying Motion for Extension of Time. The clerk of this court initially docketed this appeal as subject to the criminal fast track provisions of NRAP 3C. fn1[It appears that the district court entered a written judgment of conviction on February 26, 2003, after this appeal was initially docketed in this court. Therefore, pursuant to NRAP 3(e), the clerk of the district court shall promptly transmit a certified copy of the written judgment of conviction to the clerk of this court.] It appears that appellant was sentence to serve a term of life in the Nevada State Prison with the possibility of parole; therefore, this appeal is exempt from the fast track provisions. Appellant shall have to and including June 13, 2003, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. fn2[In the absence of any objection to the sufficiency of the rough draft transcripts to adequately inform this court, counsel need not file a certified transcript in this appeal as ordinarily required by NRAP 9. But should either counsel object to the sufficiency of the rough draft transcript or cite to transcripts not previously prepared and on file, counsel shall file and serve a transcript request form.] Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with the schedule set forth in NRAP 31. In light of the above, appellant's motion of March 31, 2003, for an extension of time to file the fast track statement is hereby denied as moot. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 03-05667 | |
04/11/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order/judgment of conviction filed in district court on: February 26, 2003. | 03-06116 | |
05/02/2003 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 03-07483 | |
05/14/2003 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 03-08239 | |
05/14/2003 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 03-08240 | |
05/19/2003 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: December 4, 2002; December 16, 2002; Janurary 16, 2002; and January 27, 2003. Court Reporter: Peggy Isom. | 03-08414 | |
06/11/2003 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 03-09768 | |
07/24/2003 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed. | ||
10/23/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 03-17652 | |
10/23/2003 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
02/05/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP04-NB/DA/MG | 04-02286 | |
03/02/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 04-02465 | |
03/02/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/29/2004 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 4, 2004. | 04-02465 |