judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PAUL S. BRUCE, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1065
Short Caption:PAUL S. BRUCE, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10424-86Filed Date:07/29/1988

Opening Event Date:07/29/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/28/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/27/1989
Argued/Submitted:12/14/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/08/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPaul S. Bruce, Jr.N
Lillian Alvarez Mcewen YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
William J. Hochul YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BRUCE JR., PAUL S. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CO-DEFENANT SMITH, VICTOR NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 12/1/89 ORD: GRT APLT'S REQ. NOTE - 02 TO RESCHD ARGUMENT AND THIS NOTE - 03 APPEAL IS RESCHD FOR ARGUMENT NOTE - 03 ON THURSDAY, DECEMBER 14, 1989 NOTE - 04 AT 1:30 P.M. THE PARTIES WILL NOTE - 04 BE ALLOWED 15 MINUTES PER SIDE NOTE - 05 FOR ARGUMENT. NOTE - 05
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/12/14 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - MCEWENL FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - HOCHULW FOR - APPELLEE
07/29/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/28/1988ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DSA & SRT & FEE OR DISMISS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD DSA
10/05/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 101088 SCHPRD DSA
10/05/1988$50.00 DOCKETING FEE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/07/1988$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1988DESIGNATION OF RECORD JB PANEL SCDATE 101088 SCHPRD DR
10/11/1988STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1988FiledRecord Completed
10/28/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RT(11 PGS/KACZOROWSKI)(10 PGS /BURNS)(29 PGS/PAVLISH) AD PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD R
10/28/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(82 PGS/HAWKINS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/30/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/20/89 (NO OPE) PANEL SCDATE 120788 SCHPRD BA
01/18/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 1/20/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 010489 SCHPRD V
01/31/1989ORDER DIRG BA BE FILED W/IN 10 DAYS OR CASE SHALL STAND DISMISSED FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 021389 SCHPRD BA
02/15/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(49 PGS/TREMEL) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-14-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 032089 SCHPRD BE
04/13/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 16, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TO TL FL BRF TO 5/16/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 042589 SCHPRD OPA
05/11/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (66 PGS RT - TREMEL) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/12/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-15-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 051689 SCHPRD BE
06/09/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/15/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 052289 SCHPRD CHECK
06/14/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-20-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 061589 SCHPRD BE
06/20/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/27/1989FiledBriefing Completed
06/27/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/27/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM & BRF OF APLE IS FL; SCHED CASE AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 062689 SCHPRD OPA
12/01/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 THRU 5 SL PANELBETESC SCDATE 111489 SCHPRD VS
12/14/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/14/1989ARGUED PANELBETESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF ORDER APPEALED FROM PANELBETESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/08/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD