judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONALD THOMAS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1064
Short Caption:RONALD THOMAS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7937-87Filed Date:08/18/1988

Opening Event Date:08/18/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/06/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/13/1989
Argued/Submitted:11/28/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/21/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRonald Thomas N
Mindy A. DanielsYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Henry S. Hoberman YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901THOMAS, RONALD UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/11/28 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - DANIELSM FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - HOBERMANH FOR - APPELLEE
08/18/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/29/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MINDY A. DANIELS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/15/1988MEMORANDUM MS DANIELS NEVER RECEIVED APPOINTMENT VOUCHER; RESENT THIS DATE/DSA IN 10 DAYS GG PANEL SCDATE 090888 SCHPRD DSA
09/23/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD DSA
01/06/1989FiledRecord Completed
01/06/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/06/1989RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 101788 SCHPRD R
01/06/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(330 PGS /PIRFO) AD PANEL SCDATE 110188 SCHPRD RT
02/15/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-17-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 021589 SCHPRD BA
02/21/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/17/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD X
03/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 031789 SCHPRD BA
03/21/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL LDG BRIEF,CLK TO FL LDG BRF APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD V
05/11/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-13-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 051289 SCHPRD BE
05/12/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/13/89. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 051289 SCHPRD M
06/13/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7/13/89 MLR PANEL SCDATE 061389 SCHPRD BE
06/27/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/13/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 062689 SCHPRD OPA
07/13/1989FiledBriefing Completed
07/13/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 071389 SCHPRD BE
11/28/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/28/1989ARGUED PANELFESTMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFESTMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/21/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD