judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NGUYEN (TAM) VS. STATE C/W 41549

Case Information: 40955
Short Caption:NGUYEN (TAM) VS. STATE C/W 41549Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:40955*, 41549 Related Case(s): 33724 , 38415 , 41549 , 42263
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C150572Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/11/2003How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/18/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/18/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-02725
03/13/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. 2/14/03 Order Denying Pro Per Motion to Vacate Set Aside Illegal Judgment. Due Date: 10 days
03/19/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order/judgment of conviction filed in district court on: February 14, 2003. 03-04675
04/02/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.) fn1[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential. Nos. 40955/ 40965/ 40973/ 41065/ 41089-cases are not consolidated. 03-05515
07/11/2003Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 5. 03-11695
07/11/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/02/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. We conclude that Nguyen is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP04-RR/ML/WM. Nos. 40955/41549. 04-00068
01/27/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-00401
01/27/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/09/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 29, 2004. 04-00401