judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MOHSEN KAHALATBARI V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0683
Short Caption:MOHSEN KAHALATBARI V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2313-85Filed Date:06/15/1987

Opening Event Date:06/15/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/26/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/23/1990
Argued/Submitted:12/06/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/08/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMohsen Kahalatbari N
Charles A. Kubinski YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Carolyn K. Kolben YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901KAHALATBARI, MOHSEN UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 031089 ORDER: VACATE APPOINT- NOTE - 01 MENT OF CHARLES A. KUBINSKI, NOTE - 02 ESQ., APPOINT BETTY M. HUNTER, NOTE - 02 ESQ. AS COUNSEL TO REPRESENT NOTE - 03 APLT ON APPEAL; FO: NEWLY NOTE - 03 APPOINTED COUNSEL TO FILE A NOTE - 04 STATE IN 20 DAYS INDICATING NOTE - 04 WHETHER RT WILL BE ORDERED. NOTE - 05 050489 OR: OF CHARLES A. NOTE - 05 KUBINSKI, ESQ; FO MS. HUNTER NOTE - 06 TO TRANSMIT REC, INCL TRANSC NOTE - 06 TO MR. KUBINSKI W/IN 15 DAYS; NOTE - 07 FO BA SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 NOTE - 07 DAYS FROM DATE REC, INCL TRANS NOTE - 08 HAS BEEN DOCKETED. FVH NOTE - 08 NOTE - 09 3/22/90 ORD: COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 09 (KUBINSKI ESQ) IS DIRECTED TO NOTE - 10 FILE THE BRIEF W/IN 10 DAYS OR NOTE - 10 APPOINTMENT MAY BE VACATED.
06/15/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CHARLES A. KUBINSKI, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/11/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT PB PANEL SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD DSA
08/12/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 081487 SCHPRD R
10/11/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 082187 SCHPRD CHECK
02/07/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL W/IN 20 DAYS TO FILE STMT RE RT (NAME OF RPTR, DATE ORD, EST DATE) FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/10/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BETTY M. HUNTER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/10/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 04. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 112587 SCHPRD RT
03/10/1989RECEIVED STATEMENT FROM APPELLANT'S COUNSEL (CHARLES A. KUBINSKI) REGARDING TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT (FROM ATTY BETTY HUNTER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/27/1989MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION ORDER VACATING APPOINTMENT OF CHARLES A. KUBINSKI AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/11/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(41 PGS/PRIFO) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/04/1989ORDER GRTG MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATIN & VACATING 3/10/89 ORD VACATG APTMT (SEE NOTE FIELDS 5-8) PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/25/1989COURT REPORTER MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FL TRANSCRIPT TO 10/30/89 ACG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1989FiledRecord Completed
10/26/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(369 PGS/JACKSON) AD PANEL SCDATE 103089 SCHPRD RT
03/12/1990ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FILE BRIEF W/IN 10 DAYS OR APPOINTMENT WILL BE VACATED JB PANELRO SCDATE 120589 SCHPRD BA
03/22/1990ORDER THIS COURT'S 3/12/90 ORDER IS HEREBY VACATED, F/O THAT (SEE NOTES 9 THRU 10) JB PANELRO SCDATE 032290 SCHPRD BA
04/02/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-2-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 040290 SCHPRD BA
05/09/1990ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FILE BRIEF W/IN 10 DAYS OR APTMT TO BE VACATED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 052190 SCHPRD BA
06/12/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAY EXTENSION (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 062290 SCHPRD BE
06/22/1990ORDER GRNT APLE MO X TM TO FILE BRF TO W/IN 30 DYS FROM DATE OF THIS ORD. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 061590 SCHPRD GR
07/23/1990FiledBriefing Completed
07/23/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 072390 SCHPRD BE
08/16/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (7-PGS/SHELTON) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/06/1990SUBMITTED PANELFESCMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFESCMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/08/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD