judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES COUSART V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1120
Short Caption:JAMES COUSART V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F-045-88Filed Date:08/19/1988

Opening Event Date:08/19/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/19/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/04/1990
Argued/Submitted:03/19/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/27/1993

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames Cousart N
James W. KleinNY
Richard S. Greenlee YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901COUSART, JAMES AKA JOHN WARD UNITED STATES
01/01/190210 ADDT'L COPIES FOR EN BANC ARGUMENT *PER 2/12/92 ORDER*
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 8/8/89 ORD: SUA SPONTE THAT NOTE - 01 THIS CT'S 8/3/89 ORDER GRTG NOTE - 02 APLT'S MO TO FILE BRF ON OR NOTE - 02 BEF 8/21/89 IS HEREBY AMENDED NOTE - 03 TO REFLECT THAT THE BRF OF NOTE - 03 APLT SHALL BE FILED ON OR NOTE - 04 BEFORE 8/31/89. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 2/5/92 EN BANC ORD: DENY PET NOTE - 05 FOR REHEARING; VACATE OPINION NOTE - 06 AND JMT OF 9/20/91; AND CLERK NOTE - 06 SHALL SCHD THIS CASE FOR NOTE - 07 ARGUMENT BEFORE THE COURT NOTE - 07 SITTING EN BANC AS SOON AS THE NOTE - 08 CALENDAR PERMITS. COUNSEL ARE NOTE - 08 DIRTD TO PROVIDE 10 COPIES OF NOTE - 09 THE BRFS HERETOFORE FILED TO NOTE - 09 THE CLK ON OR BEFORE 2/18/92. NOTE - 10 JUDGE KERN VOTED TO GRANT THE NOTE - 10 PETITION FOR REHEARING AND NOTE - 11 JUDGE FARRELL IS RECUSED FROM NOTE - 11 THIS CASE.
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/04/11 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - GREENLEER FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - DEJESUSG FOR - APPELLEE
08/19/1988NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/14/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/23/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD DSA
09/23/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT OF TRANSCRIPT ORDERED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/23/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 101888 SCHPRD R
11/23/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (221 PGS RT - FINNERIN) GT PANEL SCDATE 112088 SCHPRD RT
06/19/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (65 PGS RT - WATKINS) GT PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
06/19/1989RECORD COMPLETED
07/31/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 31ST (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 073189 SCHPRD BA
08/03/1989ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/21/89. PANEL SCDATE 080289 SCHPRD M
08/08/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 4 SL PANELRBH SCDATE 082189 SCHPRD BA
08/31/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 083189 SCHPRD BA
10/03/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11-6-89 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 100589 SCHPRD BE
10/23/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/6/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 101689 SCHPRD OPA
11/03/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 6, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 110689 SCHPRD BE
11/21/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 12/06/89; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 112089 SCHPRD V
12/06/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF EMERGENCY ONE DAY TO 12/8/89 RJG PANEL SCDATE 120689 SCHPRD BE
12/11/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/04/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 010390 SCHPRD V
01/04/1990BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/07/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/20/1990LETTER GRANT REQ OF APLT FOR ARG ON SUM CAL OF 4/11/90. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 031990 SCHPRD OPE
04/11/1990ARGUED PANELRGNWKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/30/1990CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1990MEMORANDUM RULE 28 (K) CERT OF 8/29/90 SENT TO DIVISION. MEH PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/20/1991REVERSED JUDGMENT RV JUDGMENTS OF CONVICTION PANELRGNWKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/03/1991MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC TO 10/18 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/07/1991ORDER GRANT APLE'S MOT TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REHEAR/REHEAR EN BANC TO 10/18/91. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 101491 SCHPRD CHECK
10/18/1991MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC OF APLE TO WEEK PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1991ORDER GRNT APLE'S MO X TM TO FL PET FOR REH/REH EB; TO BE FLD ON OR BEFORE 10/25/91. CKT PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/25/1991PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC AJ PANEL SCDATE 102591 SCHPRD MRRB
10/31/1991ORDER THAT APLT W/I 20 DAYS SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO PET FOR REH REH EN BANC (10 COPIES) SL PANELFE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1991APPELLANT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITIONTO 21 DAYS - NO OPPO PMB PANEL SCDATE 112091 SCHPRD OPA
11/22/1991ORDER GRNT APLT'S UNOPPO MO TO X TM TO FL OPPO TO PET FOR REH/REH EB ON OR BEFORE 12/10/91 CKT PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1991APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APLE PETITION FOR REHEARING OR REHEARING EN BANC AJ PANEL SCDATE 121191 SCHPRD OPA
02/05/1992ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC SEE NOTE FIELDS 5 THRU 11 (PRINTED @ p.2701-A) SL PANELEB SCDATE 102891 SCHPRD VS
02/06/1992RECEIVED 10 EXTRA COPIES OF APPELLEE'S BRIEF FOR REHEARING EN BANC RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/11/1992APPELLANT'S BRIEF 10 ADDITIONAL COPIES OF FOR EN BANC ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 021892 SCHPRD BA
02/12/1992ORDER SS CASE SCHEDULED FOR EN BANC THURS, MARCH 19, 1992, 9:30 AM MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 020592 SCHPRD READY
03/19/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/19/1992ARGUED before JJ RG FE TE ST SC WG KG SU KN Argument by Jo-Ann Wallace, Esq., counsel for appellant; and by John R. Fisher, Esq., counsel for appellee,
12/18/1992AFFIRMED
01/27/1993MANDATE ISSUED
03/22/1993NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI
04/21/1993COPY OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI