judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COMITO (ROBERT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38097
Short Caption:COMITO (ROBERT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C173544Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/27/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/27/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-10887
07/02/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 01-11161
07/10/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 4/13/01 and 6/14/01. Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky. Filed in district court on: July 6, 2001. 01-11577
07/16/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 4/13/01 and 6/14/01. Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky. 01-12042
08/03/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-13126
08/03/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-13127
08/14/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-13797
09/05/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn4[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted. We note that appellant is already represented by appointed counsel in this case and, therefore, we need not remand this case for the appointment of counsel.] SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-14990
10/02/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-15007
10/02/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/23/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 9, 2001. 01-15007