Case Information: 10-CM-0886 | |||
Short Caption: | KENNETH WAYNE STEWART V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CMD2771-10 | Filed Date: | 07/12/2010 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 07/12/2010 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 09/02/2010 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 03/16/2011 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Kenneth Wayne Stewart | Y |
| |||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
07/12/2010 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
07/28/2010 | On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Kyle McGonigal, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC) | |||
07/28/2010 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Kyle McGonigal, Esquire | |||
09/02/2010 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (101pgs/Tape) 6/18/10 proc. w/CD | |||
09/02/2010 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
09/13/2010 | MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT (unopposed) | |||
09/13/2010 | RECEIVED - Statement Regarding Transcript | |||
09/20/2010 | ORD GR MOT FOR LV TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCIPT and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. Ap. R. 31. (By: JAC) | |||
09/20/2010 | STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) | |||
09/20/2010 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (Pretrial services report filed 2/16/10)*********SEALED | |||
09/21/2010 | RECORD INDEX | |||
09/21/2010 | RECORD COPIES | |||
10/13/2010 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF | |||
10/13/2010 | APPENDIX (attached to brief) | |||
11/16/2010 | APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE | |||
11/17/2010 | TMC - motion for summary affirmance - appellant's brief | |||
02/22/2011 | ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED. See Oliver T. Carr Mgm't INc. v. Nat'l Deli Inc. 397 A.2d 914, 915 (DC 1979)...SEE HARDCOPY It is *****MORE***** | |||
02/22/2011 | FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal is HEREBY AFFIRMED. (GLTHTE) (jl) | |||
03/16/2011 | MANDATE ISSUED |