judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHN DOE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1136
Short Caption:JOHN DOE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1309-87Filed Date:09/01/1988

Opening Event Date:09/01/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/10/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/05/1989
Argued/Submitted:12/12/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
John A. Briley, Jr.YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DOE UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 2/3/89 ORD: DENY MO OF APLT NOTE - 01 IN 88-1145 TO AMEND 11/4/88 NOTE - 02 ORDER; 11/4/89 ORDERED IS NOTE - 02 CLARIFIED TO EXTENT THAT THE NOTE - 03 CLK SHALL DESIGNATE ANY FLNGS NOTE - 03 IN 88-1145 AS FLNGS IN 88-1136 NOTE - 04 AND THE CAPTION IN THIS CASE NOTE - 04 SHALL READ DOE V. U.S.. NOTE - 05 3/10/89 ORD: DSA NOT LODGED, NOTE - 05 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO SHOW CAUSE NOTE - 06 IN 10 DAYS WHT HIS APPMT SHLD NOTE - 06 NOT BE VACATED & HIS NAME RE- NOTE - 07 MOVED FROM THE PANEL OF AT- NOTE - 07 TORNEY'S TO RECV APPTMS IN PRO NOTE - 08 CEEDING COVERED BY CJA. NOTE - 08
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/12/12 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BRILEYJ FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - MULLENL FOR - APPELLEE
09/01/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/16/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN A. BRILEY, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/21/1988ORDER APLT DSA DUE IN 10 DAYS - NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD DSA
11/04/1988ORDER 88-1145 DISMISSED AS DUPLICTV OF 88-1136 DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO AMEND NOVEMBER 4TH ORDER OF DISMISSAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1989FiledRecord Completed
01/10/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 103188 SCHPRD R
02/03/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04. DAS PANELMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/23/89 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 022189 SCHPRD BA
03/10/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05-08. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 103188 SCHPRD DSA
04/03/1989APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER DATED 3/10/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 032089 SCHPRD ANSA
04/17/1989ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 040489 SCHPRD Q
05/17/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-24-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 051789 SCHPRD BA
05/24/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM & BRF OF APLT FL; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 053089 SCHPRD CHECK
07/05/1989FiledBriefing Completed
07/05/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 070589 SCHPRD BE
10/27/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1989LETTER GRTG REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT SL PANELDDW SCDATE 103089 SCHPRD N
12/12/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/12/1989ARGUED PANELRGBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD