judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DOE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1145
Short Caption:DOE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1309-87Filed Date:09/01/1988

Opening Event Date:09/01/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Appellant Doe N
John A. Briley, Jr.NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DOE UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 10/12/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 01 FOR LV TO FL DSA & CLK TO FL NOTE - 02 DSA & TO DOCKET CASE W/CAPTION NOTE - 02 DOE V. U.S.; CLK OF SUPER NOTE - 03 CRT TO TRANSMIT REC FORTHWITH; NOTE - 03 CLK TO MAINTAIN CASE UNDER NOTE - 04 SEAL PENDG DISP BY THIS CRT. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 **CASE UNDER SEAL** NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 2/3/89 ORD: DENY MO OF APLT TO NOTE - 06 AMEND 11/4/88 ORD; 11/4/88 ORD NOTE - 07 CLARIFIED TO EXTENT THAT THE NOTE - 07 CLK SHALL DESIGNATE FLNGS IN NOTE - 08 THIS CASE AS FILINGS IN 88- NOTE - 08 1136 & CHANGE CAPTION IN 88- NOTE - 09 1136 TO DOE V. U.S.. NOTE - 09
09/01/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/12/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 093088 SCHPRD V
11/04/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
11/04/1988ORDER CASE DISMISSED AS DUPLICATIVE OF 88-1136 DAS PANELRO SCDATE 111488 SCHPRD R
11/04/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
02/03/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06-09. DAS PANELMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD