judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TERRY EVANS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1118
Short Caption:TERRY EVANS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1468-88Filed Date:08/29/1988

Opening Event Date:08/29/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/21/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/24/1990
Argued/Submitted:01/15/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/21/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTerry Evans N
Stephen L. BragaYY
AppellantJohn Doe N
Charles A. Kubinski YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Gerald F. Ivey YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901EVANS, TERRY UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CO-DEFENDANTS AARON HOWARD AND NOTE - 01 ERIC WEAVER NOTE - 02 2/28/90 ORD: GRANTG APLE'S MO NOTE - 02 TO CONSOL 88-1118,88-1471 AND NOTE - 03 88-1472; BRIEFS OF APLTS IN NOTE - 03 88-1471 AND 88-1472 DUE IN 30 NOTE - 04 DAYS; NFX; BRF OF APLE DUE 30 NOTE - 04 DAYS AFTER APLTS' BRFS ARE FLD NOTE - 05 CON 88-1471 AND 88-1472 NOTE - 05
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/01/15 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - IVEYG FOR - APPELLEE TRDATE- 91/01/15 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BRAGAS FOR - APPELLANT EVANS ATTY 2 - KUBINSKIC FOR - APLT HOWARD ATTY 3 - ROSST FOR - APLT WEAVER
08/29/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/16/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEPHEN L. BRAGAS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS TWO (2) DAYS OUT OF TIME GT PB PANEL SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD DSA
09/28/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/18/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/27/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD (RTC) PANEL SCDATE 102888 SCHPRD R
02/13/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(32 PGS/HART) AD PANEL SCDATE 110288 SCHPRD RT
05/17/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (272 PGS/TREMEL) AD PANEL SCDATE 123088 SCHPRD RT
06/23/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH 88-1471 & 88-1472 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/27/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/28/89 MLR PANEL SCDATE 072789 SCHPRD BE
02/28/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-04 CWC PANEL SCDATE 103088 SCHPRD RT
03/30/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 88-1472 AJ PANEL SCDATE 033090 SCHPRD BA
04/05/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 88-1471 TO 4/19/90 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN 88-1471 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1990RECEIVED APPELLNAT'S BRIEF IN 88-1471 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/15/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN NO. 88-1471 FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/15/1990ORDER GRTG MOTION & DIRG CLK TO FILE APLT'S LODGED BRIEF; BE DUE W/ IN 30 DAYS. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 21, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 071590 SCHPRD BE
07/17/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/21/90; NFX. JJ PANELFF SCDATE 071290 SCHPRD B
08/16/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(34 PGS/TREMEL) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1990FiledRecord Completed
08/21/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 082190 SCHPRD BE
08/31/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLE TO FILE CORRECTED BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1990RECEIVED CORRECTED BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/24/1990FiledBriefing Completed
09/24/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF CORRECTED BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/24/1990ORDER GRANTG APLE'S MO FOR LV TO FL A CORRECTED BRF & LODGED CORRECTED BRF IS FILED. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 091990 SCHPRD V
01/15/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/15/1991ARGUED PANELFETEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFETEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/21/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD