judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WALKER LATIMORE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1113
Short Caption:WALKER LATIMORE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead: 88-CF-1112 Consolidated:88-CF-1113
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11425-87Filed Date:08/25/1988

Opening Event Date:08/25/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/11/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/28/1990
Argued/Submitted:01/17/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/11/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWalker Latimore N
Nicholas J. Hluchyj NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
M. Elizabeth Kent YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Ann L. Rosenfield YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LATIMORE, WALKER UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 88-1112 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 111390 ORD: COUNSEL'S MOT TO NOTE - 02 W/D IS GRANTED, APPOINTMENT OF NOTE - 03 NICHOLAS J. HLUCHYJ, ESQ. IS NOTE - 03 VACATED; F/O M. ELIZABETH KENT NOTE - 04 IS APPOINTED TO REPRESENT APLT NOTE - 04 IN THIS CASE; F/O CASES RE- NOTE - 05 MOVED FROM 11/28/90 REG CAL & NOTE - 05 TO BE RESCHED ASAP.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/01/17 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - KENTM FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - ROSENFIELDA FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 HLUCHYJN VACATED: 11/13/90
08/25/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/16/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) NICHOLAS J. HLUCHYJ, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/21/1988ORDER APLT DSA DUE IN 10 DAYS-NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD DSA
10/27/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 103188 SCHPRD DSA
12/21/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RT(27 PGS/RONAN) AD PANEL SCDATE 102488 SCHPRD R
12/27/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 4/7/88 RT FROM CT RPTR SCHERTZER. EBP PANEL SCDATE 103088 SCHPRD RT
03/23/1989ORDER SS, CONS 88-1112 & 88-1113; BRF OF APLT DUE 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETE REC IS FILED. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (157 PGS - S.BURNS) JB PANEL SCDATE 111588 SCHPRD RT
11/11/1989FiledRecord Completed
04/17/1990ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL BRF IN 10 DAYS OR REFER TO BPR. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 101089 SCHPRD BA
04/27/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 042790 SCHPRD BA
05/22/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 28, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 060190 SCHPRD BE
06/12/1990ORDER GRT APLE MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 6/28/90. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 052390 SCHPRD B
06/28/1990FiledBriefing Completed
06/28/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 062890 SCHPRD BE
11/07/1990COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF APPELLANT & TO APPOINT NEW COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) M. ELIZABETH KENT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-05. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 110790 SCHPRD VS
01/17/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/17/1991ARGUED PANELRGTEWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/20/1991VACATED IN PART/AFFIRMED IN PART JUDGMENT AF IN PART & VA/RM IN PART TRIAL COURT'S JUDGMENT PANELRGTEWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/20/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - VAAF METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE 597 A.2d 362
09/20/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 2726
10/03/1991LETTER OF APLT ATTORNEY RE: CASE ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1991MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING LTR DATED 9/30/91 FROM COUNSEL FOR APLT RE MODI- FICATION OF OPINION TO DIV. MH PANELJAC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/30/1991ORDER AMENDMENT TO OPINION FILED IN THIS CASE ON 9/20/91. AC (PRINTED @ p.4220) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD