judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL A. PARKER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1066
Short Caption:MICHAEL A. PARKER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Theft Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1864-88Filed Date:08/18/1988

Opening Event Date:08/18/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:09/11/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/21/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael A. Parker N
Thomas G. Ross YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Ann K. H. SimonYN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PARKER, MICHAEL A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 IS FILED. FO THAT THIS APPEAL NOTE - 01 BE SCHEDULED FOR CONSIDERATION NOTE - 02 BEFORE A MERITS DIV. AS SOON NOTE - 02 AS THE CALENDAR PERMITS.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/09/11 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - ROSST FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SIMONA FOR - APPELLEE
08/31/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS C. ROSS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/15/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 091288 SCHPRD DSA
10/12/1988RECEIVED STATEMENT OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL CONCERNING PREPARATION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 101988 SCHPRD R
07/07/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (217 PGS RT - SHELTON) GT PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
08/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9-15-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 081689 SCHPRD BA
09/15/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/15/89. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 082289 SCHPRD N
09/20/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10-16-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 091589 SCHPRD BA
10/02/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/16/89; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 092289 SCHPRD M
10/16/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 30, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 101689 SCHPRD BA
10/19/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/30/89; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 101789 SCHPRD M
11/08/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11-20-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 103089 SCHPRD BA
11/20/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 5, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 121889 SCHPRD BA
12/13/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FILE ITS BR W/IN 5 DAYS OR APTMT TO BE REFERRED TO BPR. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 011790 SCHPRD BE
01/24/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/16/90. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 011990 SCHPRD V
02/15/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-15-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 021690 SCHPRD BE
02/27/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF FOR 30 DAYS; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 022090 SCHPRD V
03/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(ORDER, JUDGE BURGES DATED 2-16-90) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/30/1990RECEIVED OF APLE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/02/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 032790 SCHPRD BE
04/10/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/10/1990ORDER GRT APLE'S MO FOR X TM TO FL BRF, & THE LODGED BRF OF APLE SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 THRU 02 JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 040390 SCHPRD B
07/20/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1990CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 (APPELLEE'S) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/24/1990MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING RULE 28 K CITE TO DIVISION FROM APLE OF 7/20. MEH PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/02/1990LETTER GRANT APLE'S RQST TO PRESENT ORAL ARGUMENT. CT PANELFF SCDATE 080290 SCHPRD OPA
09/11/1990ARGUED PANELRGSCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1991RECEIVED 9 EXTRA COPIES OF APLE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/29/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGSCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/29/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/21/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD