judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEVIN L. BELLANGER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0794
Short Caption:KEVIN L. BELLANGER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9481-86Filed Date:07/07/1987

Opening Event Date:07/07/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/07/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/17/1988
Argued/Submitted:07/14/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/12/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKevin L. Bellanger N
David C. Gray YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
John M. Seabright YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BELLANGER, KEVIN L. AKA KEVIN L. LANE UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: ROBERT L. JONES NOTE - 01
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/07/14 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - GRAYD FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SEABRIGHTJ FOR - APPELLEE
07/07/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/13/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID C. GRAY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 073187 SCHPRD CHECK
08/21/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD DSA
08/21/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PM PANEL SCDATE 090787 SCHPRD R
12/07/1987FiledRecord Completed
12/07/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(384 PGS. -- KACZOROWSKI) RJG PANEL SCDATE 090187 SCHPRD RT
12/08/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 011888 SCHPRD BA
02/17/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/17/88 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 022388 SCHPRD BE EXTDTE 031788
03/17/1988FiledBriefing Completed
03/17/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 031788 SCHPRD BE
06/08/1988ORDER SS, SCHED CASE FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 7/14/88. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/14/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/14/1988ARGUED PANELTERGSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL (PRINTED OP FILED 10/12/88) PANELTERGSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE 548 A.2d 501 (PRINTED OP FILED 10/12/88)
08/16/1988OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - PC PAGE # - 1517 -A
08/25/1988MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLEE TO PUBLISH OPINION JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO PUBLISH 8/16/88 MOJ. DAS PANELTEROSC SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD OPA