judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

VERNON WALKER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0691
Short Caption:VERNON WALKER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6485-86Filed Date:06/09/1987

Opening Event Date:06/09/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/17/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/04/1988
Argued/Submitted:11/09/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/09/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantVernon Walker N
Robert H. Haas YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Patricia A. Riley YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WALKER, VERNON UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/11/09 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - HAASR FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - RILEYPA FOR - APPELLEE
06/09/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/30/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 072787 SCHPRD CHECK
07/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROBERT H. HAAS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD R
08/17/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/17/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 092887 SCHPRD BA
10/02/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (327 PGS - RUST) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/14/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT, APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 091487 SCHPRD OPE
11/10/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DEC. 21ST MLH PANEL SCDATE 112387 SCHPRD BA
12/18/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 11, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 122187 SCHPRD BA
01/20/1988ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 011988 SCHPRD X
01/28/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 020188 SCHPRD BA
02/25/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 4, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 030388 SCHPRD BE
04/04/1988FiledBriefing Completed
04/04/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 040488 SCHPRD BE
11/09/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/09/1988ARGUED PANELRGMKPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/16/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGMKPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/16/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/09/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD