judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARY L. RAWLS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0719
Short Caption:MARY L. RAWLS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Lead: 87-CF-0652 Consolidated:87-CF-0719
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8347-86Filed Date:06/19/1987

Opening Event Date:06/19/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/20/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/18/1988
Argued/Submitted:05/04/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/30/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMary L. Rawls N
Michael L. SpekterYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RAWLS, MARY L. A/B/A MARY L. CHERRY UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: MELVIN CHERRY NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 050288 ORDER: GRANT APLE REQ NOTE - 02 TO CONS 87-652 & 87-719; FO: NOTE - 03 CT RPTR TO FILE RT OF 4/1/87 NOTE - 03 TRIAL PROCEEDING W/IN 20 DAYS; NOTE - 04 FO: APLT BR IN 87-719 DUE 40 NOTE - 04 DAYS AFT RT IS FILED & CON BR NOTE - 05 OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 CON 87-652 NOTE - 06
06/19/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/13/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 072787 SCHPRD CHECK
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MICHAEL L. SPEKTER, ESQ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/23/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD DSA
08/20/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/20/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PANEL SCDATE 081887 SCHPRD R
05/02/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 05. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 042188 SCHPRD BE
05/02/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (21 PGS - TREMEL) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/13/1988ORDER APLT BR IN 87-719 DUE W/IN 40 DAYS, CONS BR OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 052388 SCHPRD RT
07/22/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/21/88 (NO OPE) GT PB PANEL SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD BA
08/22/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD BA
09/15/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 21, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 092188 SCHPRD BE
10/20/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 28, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 102188 SCHPRD BE
11/18/1988FiledBriefing Completed
11/18/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 110188 SCHPRD OPA
05/04/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/04/1989SUBMITTED PANELFESTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/09/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFESTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/09/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/30/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD