judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THIEND R. BAKER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0847
Short Caption:THIEND R. BAKER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead: 10-CF-0829 Consolidated:10-CF-0847
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-21361-09Filed Date:07/08/2010

Opening Event Date:07/08/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/04/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:04/18/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/17/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/02/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantThiend R. Baker Y
Enid HinkesYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
B. Michael Ortwein, IIIYN
John L. HillYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/08/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/27/2010ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-CF-829 and 10-CF-847 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that Enid Hinkes, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant Thiend R. Baker in appeal no. 10-CF-847. F/O that counsel for appellant in appeal no. 10-CF-847, shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s)necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Record Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
07/27/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Enid Hinkes, Esquire
08/11/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (10-CF-847) (RT ordered/needed)
10/04/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (125 pgs/Maar) 4/19/10 proc.
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (192 pgs/Maar) 4/20/10 proc.
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (139 pgs/Maar) 4/21/10 proc.
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (63 pgs/Ramos) 4/22-23/10 proc.
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (11 pgs/tape) 6/21/10 proc. cd attached
10/04/2010RECORD COMPLETED (115A SR#1-5 A3)
10/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' briefs and the limited appendixes including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
10/12/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (SEALED pleadings)
10/12/2010RECORD COPIES (10-CF-847)
10/12/2010RECORD INDEX (10-CF-847)
10/12/2010RECORD COPIES (10-CF-829)
10/12/2010RECORD INDEX (10-CF-829)
10/12/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (SEALED pleading)
11/08/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until the end of February, 2011 (no oppo) (Gaddis)
11/09/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (Baker) 60 days no oppo
11/17/2010 On consideration of appellants Dominique Gaddis and Thiend R. Baker's unopposed motions for extensions of time within which to file their briefs and limited appendices, it is ORDERED that appellants Dominique Gaddis and Thiend R. Baker's motions are granted and appellant Dominique Gaddis' brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before February 21, 2011, and appellant Thiend R. Baker's brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before January 15, 2011. (JAC)
01/21/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF no oppo (Baker)
01/21/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief w/appdx.
01/31/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF (10-CF-829)
01/31/2011APPENDIX
02/03/2011 On consideration of appellant Thiend R. Baker's unopposed motion for leave to late file the lodged brief and limited appendix, it is ORDERED that appellant Baker's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of the order. (Castillo)
02/03/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF - Thiend R. Baker
02/03/2011LIMITED APPENDIX - Thiend R. Baker
03/07/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 4/18/11. no oppo
03/16/2011 On consideration of appellee's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before April 18, 2011. (Castillo)
04/18/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/18/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/29/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
05/02/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF (Gaddis)
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
07/01/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING (Gaddis)
07/05/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aplt (Baker)
07/13/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/26/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File - a relpy brief (Thiend R. Baker) (Appellant)
11/04/2011FiledReply Brief (Thiend R. Baker) (Appellant)
11/04/2011FiledOrder Granting aplt Baker's motion to file reply brief.
11/17/2011FiledArgued before Judges Fisher, Reid, Farrell
12/08/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher, Associate Judge, Reid, Associate Judge, Retired, and Farrell, Senior Judge)
12/19/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
12/23/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File for pet for reh/reh en banc (Baker) (Appellant)
12/29/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET to file appellant's petition for reh/reh en banc on or before January 10, 2012
01/09/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant) Thiend Baker
02/23/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for reh/reh en banc (Thiend Baker)
03/02/2012FiledMandate
03/05/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)