judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CORDELL VS. FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Case Information: 34748
Short Caption:CORDELL VS. FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A399351Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/03/1999 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/30/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Offices of Morton R. Galane--check no. 013033.
08/30/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08082
09/03/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/07/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 18, 1999. 99-09673
10/15/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-10024
11/19/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to file the docketing statement and comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 99-11500
12/02/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-12024
01/24/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the required document or show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as abandoned. 00-01136
01/28/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-01467
03/20/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 3/17/00. 00-04363
03/20/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 00-04364
04/19/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 4/18/00. 00-06236
04/19/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent's Supplemental Appendix. 00-06237
05/24/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Las Vegas Drop Box 5/22/00. 00-08685
07/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. fn1[Pursuant to NRAP 34(f)(1) we concludge that oral argument is not warranted in this appeal.] "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-12047
08/08/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13778
08/08/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-13778