Case: 01-91-00981-CV
01-91-00981-CV
10/18/1991
Miscellaneous/other civil
City of Houston, et al
Washington, Kendrick Roy
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/14/1992 | Case stored | | |
10/13/1992 | Mandate issued | | |
08/31/1992 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
08/31/1992 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/12/1992 | Submission | | |
01/31/1992 | Case ready to be set | | |
01/31/1992 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/06/1991 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
11/07/1991 | Motion to extend time to file transcript disp | Grant motion | |
11/07/1991 | Transcript filed | | |
10/18/1991 | Motion to extend time to file transcript | | |
10/18/1991 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/14/1992 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Appellant | Joyce A. Langenegger |
State | PRO SE | Kendrick Roy Washington |
Trial Court Information
151st District Court
Harris
Honorable CAROLYN C. GARCIA
90-38440