judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FELDMAN (BENJAMIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33813
Short Caption:FELDMAN (BENJAMIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C131821Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/25/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/25/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-01284
05/24/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Andrew S. Myers shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-04278
06/08/1999Other Other. Remailed 5/24/99 order to attorney Andrew S. Myers. New address: PO Box 25832, Overland Park, KS
06/29/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Direction from the Supreme Court. 99-05708
07/13/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. The fast track statement shall be filed within 30 days of this order. Briefing shall then proceed in accordance with NRAP 3C. 99-06255
07/26/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-06717
08/16/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Failure to Comply with NRS 177.025. 99-07569
08/30/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Resolving Motion or Stipulation. Fast track response due: 20 days or show cause why counsel for respondent should not be sanctioned. 99-08138
09/03/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Address; Motion to Withdraw; and Response to Motion to Dismiss. 99-08291
09/21/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-08972
11/22/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from attorney Andrew S. Myers. He is no longer practicing law in the State of Nevada, and requests that all correspondence be mailed to his Cincinnati address. 99-11660
01/03/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Change of Address for Andrew S. Myers. P.O. Box 6795 Aurora, IL 60598-0795. 00-00010
02/04/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Remand for Designation of Counsel. On September 3, 1999, appellant's counsel filed a motion to withdraw as appellant's attorney. The motion is granted. District court clerk shall file order of appointment in this court, serve counsel with this order, and submit proof of service to this court, OR file order of non-indigency in this court within 30 days; counsel shall enter appearance 10 days from date the order is filed. Apellate counsel shall then have 15 days to file a supplemental fast track statement. If a supplemental fast track statement is filed, the State shall have 10 days to file a supplemental fast track response. 00-01795
08/09/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Due Dates: Appoint counsel 30 days. From appointment: enter appearance 10 days; docketing statement 20 days; opening brief 120 days. 00-13862
08/09/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We again direct the district court to secure counsel to represent appellant in this appeal within 30 days from the date of this order. If appelllant is indigent, the district court shall have 30 days within which to appoint appellate counsel for appellant. Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 30 days days, appellant must retain appellate counsel and appellate counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. Within 5 days from the appointment of appearance of appellate counsel, the district court clerk shall: (1) transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of this order of remand on appellate counsel. Thereafter, appellate counsel shall have 10 days within which to enter an appearance with the clerk of this court. Appellate counsel shall then have 15 days within which to file a supplemental fast track statement, if appellate counsel deems a supplemental fast track statement to be necessary. If a supplemental fast track statement is filed, the State shall have 10 days within which to file a supplemental fast track response. 00-13862
09/18/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on August 28, 2000, appointing William J. Taylor as counsel for appellant. 00-16444
09/18/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: William J. Taylor. 00-16446
10/02/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Supplement Briefs and Request for Documents. 00-17345
10/09/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve a supplemental fast track statement within 30 days of this order. Alternatively, counsel for appellant shall, within 30 days of this order, file an affidavit indicating that no supplemental fast track statement will be filed. 00-17828
01/16/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Affidavit of Counsel Pursuant to N.R.A.P. 3C (g). 01-00978
01/17/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court revoling appellant's probation." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-00996
01/17/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Benjamin Feldman regarding letters dated January 9, 2001.
02/13/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-01083
02/13/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 22, 2001. 01-01083