judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FLOYD DEWAYNE GRADY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-287)
Case Number:06-287Case Docketed On:12/18/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:FLOYD DEWAYNE GRADY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:FLOYD DEWAYNE GRADY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantFloyd Dewayne GradyDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman
Bruce A. Salzburg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Evidence, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 144
Citation:197 P.3d 722

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/18/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/18/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/18/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/16/2007Motion - Stay briefing - unopposedMotionStay briefing - unopposedFinal
02/02/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/05/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/06/2007Order - Granting stay of briefing scheduleOrderGranting stayFinal
04/11/2007System - Status check - other. Contacted Ryan Roden regarding stay of briefing status check. He will check with court reporter.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
04/11/2007Event - Phone Call. Received phone call from Tina Kerin. She notified court reporter two weeks ago to complete transcripts and they will be checking on status.EventPhone CallFinal
05/14/2007Event - Phone Call. Received call from Tina Kerin indicated transcript should be filed by June 11, 2007.EventPhone CallFinal
06/11/2007System - Status check - other. Spoke with Tina Kerin. She stated transcripts were supposed to be filed today. She will call tomorrow if they haven't been filed.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
06/13/2007Event - Phone Call. Received call from Tina Kerin, she stated that "Lexie" the court reporter has completed the transcripts. She advised that the clerk of the court in Teton County didn't want her to mail the transcripts, but to hand deliver them. She will do so on 6/26/06, and then the clerk will notify us that the record is complete.EventPhone CallFinal
07/03/2007Event - Phone Call. Received from Tina Kerin at Public Defender's. She stated she received her copies of the transcripts today, and we should expect to be notified by the clerk of district court shortly.EventPhone CallFinal
07/09/2007Event - Phone Call. Left message for Debbie at District Court Clerk's Office that we were waiting for notification that transcripts have been filed in this case.EventPhone CallFinal
07/10/2007Event - Phone Call. Received call from Dee Mahoney. She stated that there was a printing/binding problem with the transcripts, and as soon as she receives them she will send us notification.EventPhone CallFinal
07/18/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter (resent upon filing of transcripts from mistrial)Notice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/03/2007Notice-Incoming - Amended index, second revised docket index.Notice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
08/30/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/30/2007Motion - Brief - exceed page limitMotionBrief - exceed page limitFinal
08/31/2007Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
09/25/2007Order - Denying motion to exceed page limitationOrderDenyFinal
10/04/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
11/16/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy on disk; and copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
12/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/07/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
12/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Kerin for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/13/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, six (6) boxes. Box 1, contains Fremont County Volumes I-IV, original papers; volume V, misc. pleadings & transcripts (NOTE: 3-7-05 A-5 Motion to Supress & 6-2-05 Supplemental Memorandum were not included (missing) in volume V); Boxes 2 & 3, contain Fremont County transcripts; Box 4, contains Teton County Volumes I-VI, original papers and exhibits; Boxes 5 & 6, contain Teton County Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/13/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
01/16/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina Kerin, Appellate Counsel for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
01/16/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/10/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/30/2008Record - Record returned to district court (6 boxes - to be returned at a later date)RecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter (record to be returned at a later date)Notice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/30/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/18/2009Service - Other - Record returned - six (6) boxes taken back with Dee Mahoney who was here for the Clerk of Court meeting.ServiceOtherFinal