judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KENNETH WONSOM V. LILLIE WILLIAMS

Case Information: 10-CV-0848
Short Caption:KENNETH WONSOM V. LILLIE WILLIAMSClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB8225-08Filed Date:07/07/2010

Opening Event Date:07/07/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/23/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/05/2011
Argued/Submitted:05/17/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/26/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKenneth Wonsom NPro SeN
AppelleeLillie Williams N
Sara KropfNY
Matthew T. Lee YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/07/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/27/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on July 7, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
08/02/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 5/21/2010) (elp)
08/18/2010RECORD INDEX
08/25/2010 It appearing that appellant has been notified by the Court Reporting Division of the Superior Court that the transcripts requested for this appeal have been prepared and are ready for transmittal to this court, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order make the necessary arrangements to have the transcripts transmitted to this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall, within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file a notice showing that appellant has paid for the transcript and attach a copy of the receipt to the notice. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
09/07/2010APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE- to court order 8/25/10
09/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (29 pgs/Tape - 5/21/10 proc.)
09/23/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/27/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
11/02/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
11/03/2010APPENDIX
11/24/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and a notice to intent to file a supplemental appendix no oppo for 14 days
11/30/2010 On consideration of appellee's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and supplemental appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief and supplemental appendix shall be filed on or before December 22, 2010. (JAC) elp
12/28/2010 On consideration of this court's order of November 30, 2010, granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and the supplemental appendix on or before December 22, 2010, and it appearing that the brief and the supplemental appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellee shall within 15 days from the date of this order, submit the brief and the supplemental appendix accompanied by a motion forleave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to being scheduled for consideration on the record and on appellant's brief without further notice. (jac)
12/28/2010RECEIVED- aple's brief (motion to late file needed)
12/28/2010RECEIVED - aple's supplemental appendix (no motion filed with appendix)
01/03/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF and to file supplemental appendix no oppo
01/05/2011 On consideration of appellee's unopposed motion for leave to late file the lodged brief and the supplemental appendix, it is ORDERED that appellee's motion is granted and the lodged brief and the supplemental appendix are filed. It is (MORE)
01/05/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
01/05/2011APPENDIX - SUPPLEMENTAL
01/05/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division as soon as the calender permits. (JAC) elp
01/05/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
04/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
04/19/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT
05/02/2011ORDER DENYING APLE MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT and this matter shall be submitted for decision on May 17, 2011, without oral argument by either party, on the record and briefs alone. (JAC)
05/17/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/17/2011SUBMITTED to Gilckman,Belson,Nebeker.
08/04/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman, Associate Judge, and Nebeker and Belson, Senior Judges.)
08/26/2011FiledMandate