judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID J. SIMON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1271
Short Caption:DAVID J. SIMON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Lead:86-CM-1271Consolidated: 86-CM-1272 , 86-CM-1273 , 86-CM-1335 , 86-CM-1362 , 86-CM-1370 , 87-CM-0576
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M2942-86Filed Date:09/12/1986

Opening Event Date:09/12/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/08/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/20/1989
Argued/Submitted:11/29/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/14/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid J. Simon N
Nina Kraut YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Erik P. Christian YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SIMON, DAVID UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: RUSSELL MOKHIBER & NOTE - 01 MARY MALONEY NOTE - 02 102286 ORD: DENY MO TO EXPEDIT NOTE - 02 W/O PREJUDICE TO MOVING FOR NOTE - 03 EXPEDITION ON THE WHOLE APPEAL NOTE - 03 SS, CONS W/86-1272, & 86-1273; NOTE - 04 CLERK OF SUPER CRT TO PREPARE NOTE - 04 & TRANSMIT RECORD FORTHWITH. NOTE - 05 CON 86-1272,-1273,-1335,-1362 NOTE - 05 CON 86-1370 & 87-576 NOTE - 06 12/5/86 ORD: DENYING MO FOR NOTE - 06 STAY OF EXECUTION OF SENTENCES NOTE - 07 AND FOR EXPEDITED APPEAL; SS, NOTE - 07 CNSOL 86-1370 WITH 86-1271+; NOTE - 08 CLK OF SUPER CT TO TRANSMIT NOTE - 08 RECORDS IN 86-1272 & 86-1273 NOTE - 09 FORTHWITH; APPOINTING NINA NOTE - 09 KRAUT TO REPRESENT APLT IN NOTE - 10 86-1370; APLTS' BRIEFS DUE 40 NOTE - 10 DAYS AFTER RECORDS. NOTE - 11 091988 ORDER: GRANT MO IN NOTE - 11 86-1231 FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO NOTE - 12 9/27/88 & GRANT APLTS MO IN NOTE - 12 86-1271, 86-1272, 86-1273, NOTE - 13 86-1370 & 87-576 FOR EXT TO NOTE - 13 FILE BRS TO 10/7/88 - NFX. FO: NOTE - 14 PETER G. KUH, ESQ., IN 10 DAYS NOTE - 14 TO FILE BR IN 86-1335 OR NOTE - 15 VACATE APPOINTMENT & REFER TO NOTE - 15 BPR. NOTE - 16 CON 86-1231*DISMISSED 10/13/88 NOTE - 16 NOTE - 17 1/27/89 ORD: DENYING MO TO NOTE - 17 SEVER IN 86-1362; CLK TO FILE NOTE - 18 LODGED BRIEF OF APLT IN NOTE - 18 86-1335; BRIEF OF APLTS IN NOTE - 19 REMAINING CASES DUE BY 2/27/89 NOTE - 19 ; ANY REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS NOTE - 20 WILL BE GRANTED ONLY IN EXTRA- NOTE - 20 ORDINARY CIRCUMSTANCES.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/11/29 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - KRAUTN FOR - APLTS SIMON etc ATTY 2 - KUHP FOR - APLT NININGER ATTY 3 - MAXWELLF FOR - pro se TRDATE- 89/11/29 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - CHRISTIANER FOR - APPELLEE
09/12/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/12/1986APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) NINA KRAUT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1986MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT IN SUPPORT OF EXPEDITED APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/25/1986APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APLT'S MOTION IN SUPPORT OF EXPEDITED APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 092686 SCHPRD OPE
10/02/1986APPELLANT'S REPLY TO APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 100686 SCHPRD CHECK
10/22/1986ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-04 ACG PANELMKBE SCDATE 101586 SCHPRD VS
11/17/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF SENTENCES & FOR EXPEDITED APPEALS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/19/1986APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APLT'S MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF SENTENCES PENDING APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 112486 SCHPRD OPE
11/21/1986RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PB PANEL SCDATE 111286 SCHPRD R
12/05/1986ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06-10 CWC PANELMKBE SCDATE 112686 SCHPRD VS
12/05/1986RECORD ON APPEAL IN 86-1272 GG PANEL SCDATE 010587 SCHPRD R
12/05/1986SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (37 PGS - BOSTON) GG PANEL SCDATE 122286 SCHPRD RT
12/08/1986RECORD COMPLETED ACTION SLIP SENT (R) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/23/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT GG PANEL SCDATE 011987 SCHPRD BA
02/05/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (12 PGS - OLIVER) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/25/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 VOL. I & II (1,777 PGS - WHALEN) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/04/1988ORDER SS CONS 86-1331,1362,1335 & 87-576 W/86-1271, ETC.; FO: APLTS BR DUE IN 40 DAYS. PANELPY SCDATE 030287 SCHPRD RT
05/24/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 86-1362 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/13/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7/25/88 IN 86-1231 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 061388 SCHPRD BA
06/13/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/12/88 IN 86-1271, 1272, 1273, 1370 & 87-576 GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/16/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 40 DAYS IN 86-1335 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORD. PB PANELPY SCDATE 070188 SCHPRD V
08/08/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 7, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 081888 SCHPRD BA
08/17/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 27, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 11 - 15. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 090788 SCHPRD M
09/29/1988STIPULATION TO DISMISS APPEAL IN CASE #86-1231 JB PANEL SCDATE 092788 SCHPRD BA
09/30/1988RECEIVED APPELLANTS BRIEF IN 86-1335 AD PANEL SCDATE 092988 SCHPRD BA
10/07/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 100788 SCHPRD BA
10/13/1988ORDER APPEAL 86-1231 IS HEREBY DISMISSED. PB PANELPY SCDATE 101188 SCHPRD CHECK
10/14/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN 86-1335 JB PANEL SCDATE 102488 SCHPRD CHECK
11/30/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 07-09 IN 86-1335. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/19/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (71 PGS RT-WHALEN) MLR PANEL SCDATE 020189 SCHPRD RT
12/30/1988MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT, PRO SE, IN 86-1362 TO SEVER FROM OTHER CASES MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/04/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 86-1335 MLR PANEL SCDATE 122088 SCHPRD BA
01/17/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN NO. 86-1335 CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 17-20 CWC PANELMK SCDATE 011189 SCHPRD OPE
02/27/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 022789 SCHPRD BA
04/03/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 3RD (NO OPA) JB PANEL SCDATE 040389 SCHPRD BE
04/13/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FL THE BRF TO 5/3/89. PANEL SCDATE 041389 SCHPRD CHECK
05/03/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 2ND JB PANEL SCDATE 050389 SCHPRD BE
06/02/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7/3/89 MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/27/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/3/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 061489 SCHPRD OPA
07/03/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 7, 1989 RJG DAS PANEL SCDATE 070389 SCHPRD BE
07/07/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1989FiledBriefing Completed
07/20/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 071989 SCHPRD X
07/21/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/29/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/29/1989ARGUED PANELNWFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1990AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELNWFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -PC CITE 570 A.2d 305
02/21/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - PC PAGE # - 0432
03/14/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD