Case: 08-0027
08-0027
01/11/2008
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
CHERYL SUE WALLINGFORD
TRINITY UNIVERSAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/21/2008 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | Appendix (12) filed on behalf of Cheryl Sue Wallingford. | |
02/21/2008 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | PFR (12) filed on behalf of Cheryl Sue Wallingford. | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/11/2008 | Case Stored | G02 Row 2 A-3 | | |
06/30/2008 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Final Order sent to the Court of Appeals | | |
05/16/2008 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
03/18/2008 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
03/14/2008 | Response Waiver filed | Response waiver filed on behalf of Trinity Universal Ins. Co. (3) | | |
02/21/2008 | Appendix Filed | Appendix (12) filed on behalf of Cheryl Sue Wallingford. | | |
02/21/2008 | Petition for Review | PFR (12) filed on behalf of Cheryl Sue Wallingford. | | |
02/14/2008 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | 2nd m/e/t to file pet/rev is granted. Pet/rev is due February 19, 2008. Further requests will be disfavored. | |
02/13/2008 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | to Mr. Chris Ameel. Re: if resp intend to file a response to motion. Per Mr. Ameel, he opposed the motion but won't be filing a response. | | |
02/12/2008 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Opposed 2nd m/e/t to file pet/rev. On behalf of Cheryl Sue Wallingford. (12) | | |
01/16/2008 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Pet's m/e/t to file pet/rev. Pet/rev is due February 11, 2008. | |
01/14/2008 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | to Mr. Christopher Amee. Re: oppose/unopposed the 53.7. Per Mr. Ameel, resp opposes the motion but won't be filing a response to it. | | |
01/11/2008 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | M/E/T to file pet/rev. On behalf of Cheryl Sue Wallingford. (12) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
07/11/2008 | Case Stored | Case stored. | G02 Row 2 A-3 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Trinity Universal Insurance Company | Respondent | Mr. Christopher James Ameel |
Wallingford, Cheryl Sue | Petitioner | Ms. Helen Dryden O'Conor Mr. C. Benton Musslewhite Mr. Mark C. Sparks |
Court of Appeals Information:
07-06-00142-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 1]
253 SW3d 720, 10-23-07
7th Court of Appeals
Honorable James T. Campbell
Trial Court Information
126th District Court
Travis
Honorable Stephen Yelenosky
470,729