judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HARRIS, RANDOLPH J. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1280
Short Caption:HARRIS, RANDOLPH J. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M4996-86Filed Date:09/08/1986

Opening Event Date:09/08/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/10/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/08/1988
Argued/Submitted:10/21/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/17/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Patrick J. HooverYN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Thomas J. Tourish, Jr.YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HARRIS, RANDOLPH J. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 122487 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 01 FOR EXT TO FILE BR ONLY TO THE NOTE - 02 EXTENT THAT COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 02 W/IN 10 DAYS TO TAKE NEC STEPS NOTE - 03 TO CAUSE RT TO BE ORDERED & NOTE - 03 PREPARED FOR THIS APPEAL & NOTE - 04 FILE A STATE INDICATING SUCH NOTE - 04 W/THIS COURT.
09/08/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/31/1986APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PATRICK HOOVER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/06/1986RECORD ON APPEAL (RCT) JB PANEL SCDATE 111086 SCHPRD R
02/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (116 PGS - WRAY) GG PANEL SCDATE 012487 SCHPRD RT
02/10/1987FiledRecord Completed
03/11/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AFTER RECEIPT OF TRANSCRIPT RJG (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 032387 SCHPRD BA
09/15/1987ORDER SS, THAT COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 20 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STAT OF RT, W/EST COMP DATE. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/01/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (PGS 118 TO 155 - WRAY) PB PANEL SCDATE 070187 SCHPRD RT
10/27/1987ORDER APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD STATE
12/04/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 120787 SCHPRD BA
12/24/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 120987 SCHPRD EBP
01/04/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S 12/24/87 ORDER RJG PANEL SCDATE 010488 SCHPRD STATE
01/13/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE BY 1/26/88-NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 010488 SCHPRD EBP
02/01/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 012688 SCHPRD BA
02/08/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 021188 SCHPRD CHECK
02/25/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/25/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/31/88 (NO OPPO) PB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 032588 SCHPRD BE
02/25/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT & CLK TO FL BRF OF APLT; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 022488 SCHPRD X
03/31/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 8, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 033188 SCHPRD BE
04/05/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 4/21/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 040488 SCHPRD V
04/08/1988FiledBriefing Completed
04/08/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 042188 SCHPRD BE
10/21/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/21/1988SUBMITTED PANELFETEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFETEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/17/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD