Case Information: 44674 | |||
Short Caption: | GRANDON VS. OCWEN FEDERAL BANK C/W 41760 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 41760 *, 44674 | Related Case(s): | 41760 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A463855 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/20/2006 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/11/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
02/11/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 05-02852 | |
02/15/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days. | ||
06/06/2005 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: April 14, 2004. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson (FILED IN WRONG CASE - TRANSFERRED TO CASE NO. 41760 ON 8/17/05) | 05-11053 | |
07/14/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Failure of Appellant to Docket Appeal. | 05-14112 | |
08/17/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. These appeals arise from the same district court case and involve the same parties. We conclude that in the interest of judicial economy, these appeals should be consolidated. Accordingly, these appeals are consolidated for all appellate purposes. On May 6, 2005, appellant filed a document entitled 'Substitution of Attorneys' in Docket No. 41760. We elect to treat the substitution as a motion to withdraw in these consolidated appeals and we grant the motion. The clerk shall remove Mr. Hong as counsel for appellant in these appeals. Appellant submitted a proper person opening brief and appendix in Docket No. 41760. Respondent has moved to dismiss that appeal. Alternatively, respondent requests an extension of time to file the answering brief. Appellant has submitted an opposition to respondent's motion. [FN 1 The clerk shall file the opposition received on June 17, 2005.] We deny the motion to dismiss the appeal in Docket No. 41760. On June 10, 2005, this court entered an Order Establishing Pilot Program in Civil Appeals. In light of the establishment of our pilot program and appellant's desire to represent himself in this appeal, we conclude that appellant should be allowed to present arguments in support of his position on appeal. This court shall consider the proper person opening brief and appendix submitted by appellant in resolving the issues presented in Docket No. 41760. [FN2 The clerk shall file the appendix received on May 13, 2005, and the opening brief received on May 20, 2005.] Respondent has also moved to dismiss the appeal in Docket No. 44674. We deny the motion to dismiss the appeal in Docket No. 44674. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to pay the required filing fee in Docket No. 44674. Failure to timely pay the filing fee may result in the dismissal of the appeal in Docket No. 44674 as abandoned. We waive the requirement for appellant to file a docketing statement and request transcripts in compliance with NRAP 9(a) in Docket No. 44674. [FN3 The clerk shall provide appellant with a copy of the Instructions for Civil Litigants Without Attorneys and a Proper Person Transcript Request Form.] Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form in this court for Docket No. 44674, if appellant deems one necessary. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a supplemental opening brief that addresses the issues in Docket No. 44674. Respondent's alternative motion for an extension of time to file an answering brief, filed in Docket No. 41760, is granted to the following extent. Respondent shall have 30 days from service of appellant's supplemental opening brief to file and serve a single answering brief in these consolidated appeals. Appellant shall not file a reply brief absent further order of this court. Nos. 41760/44674 (05-16178). | ||
08/25/2005 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Axess Media Group Ltd.-check no. 1410. | ||
08/25/2005 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. Transcripts Requested: April 14, 2004. Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte. Nos. 41760/44674. (05-16872) | ||
10/26/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Regarding Supplemental Brief. These are consolidated appeals. Supplemental opening brief that addresses the issues in Docket No. 44764 due: 20 days. Respondent's combined answering brief is due: 30 days after supplemental opening brief is filed and served. Failure to file a supplemental opening brief may result in this court's dismissal of his appeal in No. 44674. Nos. 41760/44674. (05-21209) | ||
12/19/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Answering Brief. As appellant has failed to respond to this court's October 26, 2005 order, we presume that appellant intends to reply on the opening brief filed on August 17, 2005, for both appeals. Answering brief due: 30 days. Appellant shall not file a reply brief absent further order of this court. Nos. 41760/44674. (05-24588) | ||
12/28/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. A463855: 120 days. Nos. 41760/44674. (05-25291) | ||
01/19/2006 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Nos. 41760/44674 (06-01298). | ||
01/19/2006 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Supplement to Respondent's Appendix. Nos. 41760/44674 (06-01299). | ||
04/20/2006 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 5. Filed in No. 41760. Nos. 41760/44674. (06-08371) | ||
04/20/2006 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Nos. 41760/44674. | ||
07/11/2006 | Other | Returned Mail. Receipt for documents dated 04/20/06 addressed to Michael Grandon returned. No forwarding address. Nos. 41760/44674. | ||
07/27/2006 | Other | Returned Mail. Receipt for documents dated 08/25/05 (in docket no. 44674), Order filed 10/26/05, and Order filed 12/19/05 addressed to Michael Grandon returned. No forwarding address. Nos. 41760 and 44674. | ||
07/28/2006 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 12/28/05 addressed to Michael Grandon returned. No forwarding address. 41760/44674. | ||
09/19/2006 | Other | Returned Mail. Copy of Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form addresed to Michael Grandon returned. No forwarding address. Nos. 41760/44674. | ||
09/26/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. These are consolidated appeals. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn4[The district court properly awarded Ocwen attorney fees pursuant to NRS 18.010(2)(b), rather than pursuant to the attorney fees provision in the promissory note and deed of trust.] SNP06-WM/MG/JH. Nos. 41760/44674. | 06-19743 | |
10/16/2006 | Other | Returned Mail. Order of Affirmance addresed to Michael Grandon returned. No forwarding address. Nos. 41760/44674. | ||
10/24/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-20943 | |
10/24/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/03/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 26, 2006. | 06-20943 | |
01/08/2007 | Other | Returned Mail. Remittiturs issued 10/24/06 addresed to Michael Grandon returned. No forwarding address. Nos. 41760/44674. |