Case Information: 44661 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: ESTATE OF BECKER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9306974 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Hardesty | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 01/11/2006 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/10/2005 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Hardesty. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
02/10/2005 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from A.D. Jensen--check no. 1917. | ||
02/10/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 05-02688 | |
03/01/2005 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 05-04011 | |
03/04/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Transcript Request. Due Date: 10 days. | ||
03/04/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Kelley R. Carroll and Peter H. Cuttitta of Porter Simon, PC. | 05-04317 | |
03/04/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys. Kelley R. Carroll, Esq. and Peter H. Cuttitta, Esq. of Porter Simon, PC, are hereby substituted as attorney for Allan D. Jensen, in place and stead of A.D. Jensen, Esq., and Allan D. Jensen, Esq. | 05-04319 | |
03/09/2005 | Docketing Statement | Filed Response to Docketing Statement. | 05-04710 | |
03/14/2005 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/17/02, 01/08/03, and 01/10/03. To Court Reporter: Donna Davidson. | 05-04959 | |
03/23/2005 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 06/17/02, 01/08/03, and 01/10/03. Court Reporter: Donna Davidson. | 05-05649 | |
06/10/2005 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 05-11486 | |
06/10/2005 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 5. | 05-11487 | |
06/14/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. to Opening Brief. | 05-11653 | |
07/11/2005 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 05-13683 | |
07/11/2005 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. | 05-13684 | |
08/10/2005 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 05-15765 | |
08/11/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Received Proper Person Notice. Notice of Joinder with Appellant. | 05-15887 | |
08/24/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Amending Caption. On August 11, 2005, respondent Bridget B. Jensen, submitted a 'Notice of Joinder with Appellant.' fn1[The clerk shall file that proper person notice.] It appears that Bridget Jensen did not oppose appellant's position in the underlying proceedings that resulted in the order that is the subject of this appeal. Accordingly, Bridget Jensen is not a proper respondent to this appeal and has been improperly included in the caption. The clerk of this court shall amend the caption by removing 'Bridget B. Jensen, Individually, and as Guardian of the Persons and Estates of John Dyer Jensen and James Ryan Jensen' as a respondent to this appeal. | 05-16820 | |
08/24/2005 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Notice of Joinder with Appellant. | 05-15887 | |
01/11/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 06-00794 | |
01/11/2006 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP06-MD/NB/RP | ||
02/16/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP | 06-03467 | |
03/15/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-04305 | |
03/15/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/30/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 17, 2006. | 06-04305 |