judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TOWNSEND, DENNIS J. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1411
Short Caption:TOWNSEND, DENNIS J. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M2990-86Filed Date:09/26/1986

Opening Event Date:09/26/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/11/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/23/1988
Argued/Submitted:05/09/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/07/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Robert E. Sanders YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Gregory E. Jackson YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TOWNSEND, DENNIS J. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/05/09 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - SANDERSRO FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - CHRISTIANER FOR - APPELLEE
09/26/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/03/1986RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 112586 SCHPRD R
12/31/1986APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROBERT E. SANDERS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/10/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (169 PGS - HART) JB PANEL SCDATE 123186 SCHPRD RT
03/04/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AFTER PRODUCTION OF TRAN- SCRIPT PB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 040187 SCHPRD BA
09/04/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (74 PGS - SHEPARD) JB PANEL SCDATE 070187 SCHPRD RT
05/11/1988FiledRecord Completed
05/11/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (110 PGS - HART) GT PANEL SCDATE 040588 SCHPRD RT
06/13/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR A 30 DAY EXTENSION (NO OPPO) RJG (PB) PANEL SCDATE 062088 SCHPRD BA
07/18/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR THIRTY DAYS (8/17/88) (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 072088 SCHPRD BA
08/01/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 8/17/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 072288 SCHPRD V
08/17/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 081788 SCHPRD BA
09/15/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 27, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 092188 SCHPRD BE
10/25/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11/23/88 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 102788 SCHPRD BE
11/08/1988ORDER GRANT APLE MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 11/23/88-NFX. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 102688 SCHPRD M
11/23/1988FiledBriefing Completed
11/23/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 112388 SCHPRD BE
04/07/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1989LETTER GRANTING REQ OF APLT FOR ARG ON SUM CAL OF 5/9/89. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 041989 SCHPRD OPE
05/09/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/09/1989ARGUED PANELBETEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/16/1989AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELBETEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/16/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -BE CITE 559 A.2d 1319
06/16/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - BE PAGE # - 1267
07/07/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD