judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

INNOVATIVE CONSTR. SYS. VS. CLARK CO. C/W 44671

Case Information: 44663
Short Caption:INNOVATIVE CONSTR. SYS. VS. CLARK CO. C/W 44671Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:44663*, 44671 Related Case(s): 44671 , 45558
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A489693Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:02/16/2005 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/10/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Ellsworth Moody & Bennion Chtd.--check no. 10261.
02/10/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-02718
02/10/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
02/16/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/23/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Certified copy filed in district court on 2/10/05. 05-03596
02/24/2005Notice/Outgoing Letter. Carolyn Worrell. (case appeal statement)
02/25/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 05-03752
03/14/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on all parties. Issued Corrected Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 05-04956
03/15/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 05-05056
03/22/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Firm Name. Rooker Later & Rawlins is now Rooker Rawlins & Bailey. 05-05585
03/25/2005MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings on Appeal. 05-05831
04/08/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. Nos. 44663/44671-cases are not consolidated. 05-06985
08/01/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. Nos. 44663/44671-cases are not consolidated. 05-15240
08/26/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant and respondent jointly moved, on March 25, 2005, to "stay proceedings on appeal." As it appears that a notice of appeal from the district court's order in the related matter was transmitted to this court on July 7, 2005, we deny any relief requested in the motion as moot. Fn2[The Honorable Miriam Shearing, Senior Justice, and the Honorable Deborah A. Agosti, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment entered on July 14, 2005.] 05-16964
08/26/2005MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Joint Motion for Consolidation. Nos. 44663/44671/45558. 05-17008
08/30/2005Notice/Outgoing Letter. Carolyn Worrell. (Joint Motion for Consolidation-Nos. 44663/44671/45558)
11/01/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 05-21540
11/28/2005MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Associate Counsel. Timothy Berg of Fennemore Craig. 05-23264
02/16/2006Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. Denying Motion to Consolidate and Denying Motion to Associate Counsel. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. The parties have filed a joint motion to consolidate this appeal with the related appeals in Nos. 44671 and 45558. We deny the motion to consolidate at this time. These appeals may be consolidated for purposes of disposition upon completion of briefing. We deny the motion to associate Arizona attorney, Timothy Berg, as to this appeal. 06-03509
03/10/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts.
03/15/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/22/04. To Court Reporter: Free Lance Court Reporters. 06-05555
04/10/2006MotionFiled Motion. Joint Motion to Reconsider Order Denying Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 44663/44671-cases are not consolidated. 06-07523
05/15/2006MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: June 16, 2006. 06-10159
06/07/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. 06-11935
06/07/2006AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volumes 1 through 7. 06-11936
07/18/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Answering Brief.
07/31/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Stipulation Approved. We approve the parties stipulation filed on May 15, 2006, as to respondent's answering brief. Answering brief due: August 7, 2006. 06-15871
08/10/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. 06-16674
08/30/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. These appeals are consolidated for the purposes of disposition. Briefing is completed in No. 44671. The reply brief for No. 44663 is due by September 11, 2006. The court reporter filed the transcript of the proceedings on November 22, 2004, in No. 44671. Because that is the same transcript requested by appellant in No. 44663, Free Lance Court Reporters need not file a copy of that transcript in No. 44663. Nos. 44663/44671. (06-18050) 06-18050
09/05/2006BriefFiled Reply Brief. Appellant in 44663. Nos. 44663/44671. 06-18233
09/05/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief. Appellant in 44663. Nos. 44663/44671. 06-18234
05/10/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP07-MG/MD/MC. Nos. 44663/44671. 07-10412
06/05/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-11803
06/05/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/20/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 7, 2007. 07-11803