judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PURNELL, CALVIN D. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1386
Short Caption:PURNELL, CALVIN D. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M6325-86Filed Date:09/25/1986

Opening Event Date:09/25/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/21/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/22/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Jack Koppelman NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PURNELL, CALVIN D. UNITED STATES
09/25/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/03/1986RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 112486 SCHPRD R
12/31/1986APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JACK KOPPELLMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/21/1987FiledRecord Completed
02/27/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 030287 SCHPRD BA
09/02/1987ORDER SS, COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 20 DYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF RT EBP PANELPY SCDATE 080187 SCHPRD RT
09/16/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S INQUIRY OF RT COMPLETION DATE RJG PANEL SCDATE 092287 SCHPRD STATE
12/10/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (62 PGS. -- GRAYBILL) RJG PANEL SCDATE 101587 SCHPRD RT
12/11/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 012088 SCHPRD BA
02/02/1988LETTER ANDERS LTR TO APLT, RESPONSE DUE BY 3/1/88. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 012988 SCHPRD X
06/29/1988AFFIRMED JUDGMENT GRANTING MO TO W/DRAW AS COUNSEL & AFFIRMING JUDGMNT ON APPEAL. ACG PANELMKRO SCDATE 060988 SCHPRD VS
06/29/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE
07/22/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD