judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLS, WESLEY M. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1470
Short Caption:WILLS, WESLEY M. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M5256-86Filed Date:10/09/1986

Opening Event Date:10/09/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/28/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/01/1988
Argued/Submitted:10/20/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/26/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Clark U. Fleckinger, IIYN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Thomas J. Kelly YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLS, WESLEY M. UNITED STATES
10/09/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/28/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PB PANEL SCDATE 120886 SCHPRD R
02/17/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CLARK U. FLECKINGER II, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/28/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(277 PGS. -- GRAYBILL) RJG PANEL SCDATE 022787 SCHPRD RT
12/04/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JAN 6TH MLH PANEL SCDATE 120787 SCHPRD BA
01/06/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 010688 SCHPRD BA
01/26/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 4TH (NO OPPO) JB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 020588 SCHPRD BE
02/25/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/4/88 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 030488 SCHPRD BE
03/10/1988ORDER GRT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF ON OR BEF 4/4/88 NFX SL PANELPY SCDATE 022988 SCHPRD N
04/01/1988FiledBriefing Completed
04/01/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 040488 SCHPRD BE
10/20/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/20/1988SUBMITTED PANELMKBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF TRIAL COURT JUDGMENT PANELMKBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/26/1989MANDATE ISSUED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD