Case: 14-96-00458-CV
14-96-00458-CV
04/08/1996
Contract
MHI Partnership, Ltd. d/b/a/ Coventry Homes and Mcguyer Homebuilders Inc.
Joseph R. and Rebecca Longacre
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/16/2014 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
07/26/1996 | Case stored | | |
07/22/1996 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
07/22/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/22/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/21/1996 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |
06/06/1996 | Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA | GRANTED | |
06/06/1996 | Opinion issued | DISMISSED | |
06/06/1996 | Opinion issued | DISMISSED | |
06/05/1996 | Submitted | | |
06/05/1996 | Submission | | |
06/05/1996 | Submitted | | |
05/25/1996 | Appellee's brief DUE | | |
05/20/1996 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
05/20/1996 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/20/1996 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/16/1996 | Mtn.supplement record DISPOSED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STA | GRANTED | |
05/16/1996 | Supplemental record FILED - ANT,APE, | | |
05/15/1996 | Opposition filed | | |
05/08/1996 | Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA | | |
04/29/1996 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
04/29/1996 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
04/29/1996 | Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA | | |
04/08/1996 | Record due | | |
04/08/1996 | Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP | | |
04/08/1996 | Transcript FILED | | |
04/08/1996 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
03/27/1996 | Bond FILED | | |
03/07/1996 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/16/2014 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
MHI PARTNERSHIP, LTD. D/B/A/ C | Appellant | Robert H. Singleton, Jr. |
JOSEPH R. AND REBECCA LONGACRE | Appellee | W. Michael Taylor Jack Urquhart |
Trial Court Information
240th District Court
Fort Bend
92,209