judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EVERETT, HOWARD N. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1423
Short Caption:EVERETT, HOWARD N. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M18510-85Filed Date:10/07/1986

Opening Event Date:10/07/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/22/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/30/1987
Argued/Submitted:03/21/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/19/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Ronny E. Jones YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles E. Ambrose YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901EVERETT, HOWARD N. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 GRT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL NOTE - 01 BRIEF; CLK DIRTD TO FL LODGE NOTE - 02 BRIEF AND SCHD FOR CONSID NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 BEFORE MERIT DIV AS SOON AS NOTE - 03 BUS OF COURT PERMITS. JJ
10/07/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/24/1986RECORD ON APPEAL JB (NO SLIP SENT - ATTY APPT?) PANEL SCDATE 120886 SCHPRD R
12/31/1986APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RONNY E. JONES, ESQ, PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (82 PGS - RUST) JB PANEL SCDATE 010187 SCHPRD RT
06/17/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (159 PGS - RONAN) PB PANEL SCDATE 032387 SCHPRD RT
06/22/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/22/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/30/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 2ND (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD BA
08/31/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 090287 SCHPRD BA
09/30/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 29TH JB PANEL SCDATE 100187 SCHPRD BE
10/28/1987RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/30/1987FiledBriefing Completed
10/30/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/30/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03 PANEL SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD OPA
03/21/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/21/1988SUBMITTED PANELMKNWST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/28/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELMKNWST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/28/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/19/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD