judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COHEN VS. CRAWFORD

Case Information: 44659
Short Caption:COHEN VS. CRAWFORDCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/09/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee due. 09/23/05 Order-fn11: no filing fee due.jcr
02/09/2005Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Motion/Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis/Petition for an Emergency Writ of Mandamus. 05-02665
09/23/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. for Emergency Writs of Mandamus. "We deny these petitions." fn11[We grant petitioner's motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis - no filing fees are due. The clerk shall file the motions, which were provisionally received in No. 44579 on January 26, 2005, in No. 44607 on February 1, 2005, and in No. 44659 on February 9, 2005.] SNP06-WM/MG/JH. Nos. 44579/ 44607/ 44659 - cases are not consolidated. 05-18979
10/19/2005RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 05-20011
10/19/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.