judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DONALD D. RECTOR V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0277
Short Caption:DONALD D. RECTOR V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2236-87Filed Date:03/30/1987

Opening Event Date:03/30/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/02/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/02/1987
Argued/Submitted:04/02/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDonald D. Rector N
Joseph R. Conte NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RECTOR, DONALD D. UNITED STATES
03/30/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/02/1987FiledBriefing Completed
04/02/1987FiledRecord Completed
04/02/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/06/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
06/12/1990ORDER GRT APLE MO X TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/22/90. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 053190 SCHPRD B