Case Information: 34763 | |||
Short Caption: | ALBRIGHT VS. DISTRICT COURT | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9801335 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/12/2000 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/01/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Offices of Skinner Sutton & Watson--check no. 0278. | ||
09/01/1999 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Philip A. Olsen. | 99-08229 | |
09/21/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days from the date of this order. | 99-08924 | |
10/11/1999 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer and Points and Authorities of Specially Appearing Real Party in Interest Watch Tower Bible and Tract Society of Pennsylvania to Petition for a Writ of Mandamus. | 99-09821 | |
04/12/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this matter shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the papers filed herein. | 00-05884 | |
04/12/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/07/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. The districtrict court did not err in granting the motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and " . . . we deny the petition for writ of mandamus." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 00-11637 | |
08/01/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 00-13260 | |
08/01/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |