judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MAURICE GATLING V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-0864
Short Caption:MAURICE GATLING V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL10005-93Filed Date:07/08/2010

Opening Event Date:07/08/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/29/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMaurice Gatling Y
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/08/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/26/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 4(b). (BY: ETW)
07/26/2010TMC - OTSC
09/07/2010 ORDERED that this appeal is hereby DISMISSED AS UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 4 (b). (KRSTFA) (rm)
09/07/2010DISMISSED
09/29/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/18/2014FiledArchived