judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAM H. HILL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-148)
Case Number:06-148Case Docketed On:06/26/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Certiorari
Short Title:WILLIAM H. HILL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:WILLIAM H. HILL, Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerWilliam H. Hill Pro Se
RespondentThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/26/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/26/2006Petition - Writ - certiorari to restore petitioner's direct appealPetitionWrit - certiorariFinal
06/26/2006Motion - In forma pauperisMotionIn forma pauperisFinal
06/29/2006Correspondence - Incoming from petitioner with new addressCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
07/18/2006Order - Petition for review - granting in part,OrderPetition for review - grantFinal
09/06/2006Correspondence - Incoming from court reporter re completion of transcriptsCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
09/15/2006Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Findings of fact and conclusions of law pursuant to Directive of Supreme CourtRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesFindings of fact and conclusions of lawFinal
09/26/2006Order - Petition for review - deny (certiorari)OrderPetition for review - denyFinal
09/26/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal