judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES GETHERS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0051
Short Caption:JAMES GETHERS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7737-85Filed Date:01/12/1987

Opening Event Date:01/12/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/29/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/07/1988
Argued/Submitted:12/14/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/11/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames Gethers N
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Kevin A. Forder YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GETHERS, JAMES UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 1/10/89 ORD: SUA SPONTE IN NOTE - 01 LIGHT OF THIS CT'S DEC. IN NOTE - 02 GRAY V. U.S., NO. 87-116 (D.C. NOTE - 02 OCTOBER 27, 1988), THAT CNSL NOTE - 03 ARE TO FILE SUPPL MEMO W/I 30 NOTE - 03 DAYS FM DATE OF THIS ORDER, NOTE - 04 ADDRESSING THE QUESTION NOTE - 04 WHETHER, ASSUMING ARGUENDO NOTE - 05 THAT GRAY REQUIRES REVERSAL OF NOTE - 05 APLT'S CONVICTION OF NOTE - 06 DISTRIBUTION OF COCAINE, SUCH NOTE - 06 REVERSAL SHOULD HAVE ANY NOTE - 07 EFFECT ON HIS CONVICTION OF NOTE - 07 POSSESSION OF COCAINE WITH NOTE - 08 INTENT TO DISTRIBUTE. NOTE - 08
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/12/14 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - MEYERSP FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - FORDERK FOR - APPELLEE
01/12/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/29/1987RECEIVED APLT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/04/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/10/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 031087 SCHPRD R
03/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PETER H. MEYERS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (55 PGS - HART) PB PANEL SCDATE 040187 SCHPRD RT
04/29/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/28/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (14 PGS. - JANIFER) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/10/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/10/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(281 PGS. -- SHELTON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 073187 SCHPRD RT
12/22/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 19TH JB PANEL SCDATE 122187 SCHPRD BA
02/02/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 02/19/88 GREG PANEL SCDATE 011988 SCHPRD BA
03/01/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FOR LV TO FILE APLT'S BRF; CLK TO FILE BRF; APLE'S BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS PB PANELPY SCDATE 022588 SCHPRD N
03/30/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/2/88 (NO OPA) GT (PB) PANEL SCDATE 042188 SCHPRD BE
05/02/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL JUNE 2, 1988 RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 050288 SCHPRD BE
05/09/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE BRF RJG PANEL SCDATE 050988 SCHPRD OPA
06/02/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1988FiledBriefing Completed
06/07/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/14/1988ARGUED PANELNWTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/19/1988RECEIVED LETTER DATED 12/15/88 FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, RE STATUS OF CASE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 8 SL PANELNWTESC SCDATE 121688 SCHPRD VS
02/08/1989APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM AD PANEL SCDATE 020989 SCHPRD SME
02/09/1989MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 2/8 SUPP BRF OF APLE & 2/9 SUPP BRF OF APLT. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1989APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM AD PANEL SCDATE 020989 SCHPRD SMA
03/21/1989AFFIRMED IN PART/REVERSED IN PART JUDGMENT AF POSSESSION CON- VICTION & RV DISTRIBUTION CON- VICTION & RM FOR NEW TRIAL PANELNWTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AFRV METH -OPN JUDGE -SW CITE 556 A.2d 201
03/21/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - SW PAGE # - 0476
04/11/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD