judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WITHERSPOON, MYRA UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1350
Short Caption:WITHERSPOON, MYRA UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M797-86Filed Date:09/17/1986

Opening Event Date:09/17/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/16/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/25/1987
Argued/Submitted:10/28/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Thomas Reed Kennedy YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Elizabeth K. Lee YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WITHERSPOON, MYRA UNITED STATES
09/17/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/16/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/25/1987FiledBriefing Completed
10/28/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/04/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition