Case Information: 40792 | |||
Short Caption: | JOHNSON (CORNEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C182027 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/15/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/15/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 03-00796 | |
01/30/2003 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: December 11, 2002. Court Reporter: Dept. 6. Not filed in district court. | 03-01646 | |
03/14/2003 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 03-04339 | |
03/14/2003 | Fast Track Brief | Received Fast Track Statement. | 03-04341 | |
03/14/2003 | Appendix | Received Appendix. | 03-04342 | |
03/17/2003 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed March 14, 2003. The clerk shall file the fast track statement and appendix received on March 14, 2003. Respondent shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track response. | 03-04400 | |
03/17/2003 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 03-04341 | |
03/17/2003 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 03-04342 | |
03/31/2003 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: September 16, 2002. Court Reporter: Tom Mercer. Filed in district court on: March 27, 2003. | 03-05307 | |
04/09/2003 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 03-05944 | |
05/06/2003 | Order/Procedural | Order. To date, Mr. Mercer has not filed the requested transcripts. Mr. Mercer shall have 20 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the requested transcripts. | 03-07715 | |
05/14/2003 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 09/16/02 and 12/11/02. Court Reporter: Tom Mercer. | 03-08222 | |
11/07/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. fn1[The appendix submitted by Johnson in this appeal does not include either the presentence motion to withdraw the guilty plea, the State's opposition to the motion, the second amended criminal information, or the written guilty plea agreement. Counsel re cautioned that failure to comply with the requirements for appendices in the future may result in the appendix being returned, unfiled, to be correctly prepared. Failure to comply may also result in the imposition of sanctions by this court.] "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP04S-NB/MS/MG | 03-18587 | |
12/02/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 03-19309 | |
12/02/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/22/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 5, 2003. | 03-19309 |