judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EDWARD L. BELLAMY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0861
Short Caption:EDWARD L. BELLAMY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8605-89Filed Date:09/01/1989

Opening Event Date:09/01/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/10/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEdward L. Bellamy N
John T. Moran, Jr.NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BELLAMY, EDWARD L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: JAMES MCKAY NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 091989 JUDG: TREAT APLE'S OPPO NOTE - 02 AS MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRM- NOTE - 03 ANCE; APLA'S MO FOR SUMMARY NOTE - 03 REVERSAL DENIED; FO APPEAL IS NOTE - 04 SUMMARILY AFFIRMED. NOTE - 04
09/01/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/01/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN T. MORAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/01/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL OF ORDER DENYING MODIFERCATION OF CONDITIONS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S ERRATUM IN MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1989APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL JB PANEL SCDATE 090889 SCHPRD OPE
09/19/1989AFFIRMED SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-04. MEH PANELNWBETE SCDATE 091389 SCHPRD VS
09/19/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE
10/10/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD