judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RODNEY L. SIMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1637
Short Caption:RODNEY L. SIMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M5781-86Filed Date:12/02/1986

Opening Event Date:12/02/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/09/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/17/1988
Argued/Submitted:04/26/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/18/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Melvin A. Marshall YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Richard T. Moore NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Mary L. WilsonYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SIMS, RODNEY L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 120487 ORD: DEFER MO TO DISMSS NOTE - 01 TO MERTIS DIVISION; GRANT APLT NOTE - 02 MO FOR LV TO FL BRF & FL LODGD NOTE - 02 APLT BRF; W/DRAW APPEARANCE OF NOTE - 03 MELVIN MARSHALL & APPT RICHARD NOTE - 03 T. MOORE TO REPRESENT APLT ON NOTE - 04 APPEAL; NEWLY APPOINTED COUNSL NOTE - 04 TO ADVISE THIS CRT IN 20 DAYS NOTE - 05 WHETHER RT WILL BE ORDERED & NOTE - 05 PREPARED FOR THIS APPEAL. NOTE - 06 021088 ORD: GRANT MO OF FORMER NOTE - 06 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO RECONSIDER NOTE - 07 12/4/87 ORD, STATEMENT OF APLT NOTE - 07 RE RT; MO OF FORMER COUNSEL NOTE - 08 THAT THE CRT TAKE ACTION TO NOTE - 08 PRESERVE RIGHT TO COUNSEL; NOTE - 09 VACATE APPTMENT OF RICHARD T. NOTE - 09 MOORE & CLERK TO ENTER APPRNC NOTE - 10 OF MELVIN A. MARSHALL AS NOTE - 10 RETAINED COUNSEL FOR APLT; NOTE - 11 APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. NOTE - 11
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/04/26 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - MARSHALLM FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - WILSONM FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 MOORERIC VACATED 2/10/88
12/02/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/17/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPELLANT'S (M-12)RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1987ORDER DENY MO FOR LV TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. ACG PANELPY SCDATE 010587 SCHPRD RBH
02/18/1987RECEIVED RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 020287 SCHPRD R
02/19/1987ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS OTSC WHY CASE SHLD NOT BE DISMISSED. (NO DSA & FEE) EBP PANELPY SCDATE 121286 SCHPRD DSA
03/06/1987RECEIVED STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 030287 SCHPRD ANSA
03/06/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S RESPONSE TO FEBRUARY 19TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/02/1987ORDER APLT TO PAY $50 FEE AND COMPLY W/THIS COURTS RULES IN 10 DAYS OR CASE SHALL BE DISMISSED.DAS PANELPY SCDATE 030687 SCHPRD CHECK
04/09/1987FiledRecord Completed
04/09/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/09/1987$50.00 DOCKETING FEE PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/09/1987RECORD ON APPEAL MLH PANEL SCDATE 052087 SCHPRD DSA
04/10/1987$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/19/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/27/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF TIME HAVING EXPIRED JB PANEL SCDATE 062987 SCHPRD BA
07/27/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/11/1987APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS, AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE JB PANEL SCDATE 081787 SCHPRD OPA
08/25/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/04/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF ACG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/04/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RICHARD T. MOORE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/04/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-05 J. FE WOULD DENY MO TO DISMISS PANELFETEST SCDATE 100687 SCHPRD VS
12/08/1987MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DECEMBER 4TH COURT ORDER OF (MELVIN MARSHALL) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN RESPONSE TO DECEMBER 4TH ORDER REGARDING TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 122487 SCHPRD ANSA
01/04/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT THAT THE COURT TAKE ACTION TO PRESERVE RIGHT TO COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/10/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06-11 ACG PANELPY SCDATE 011988 SCHPRD Q
05/09/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR STAY BRIEFING SCHEDULE PENDING SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATION JB PANEL SCDATE 031188 SCHPRD BE
05/31/1988LETTER DATED 5/25/88 FROM MARY L. WILSON, ASST. CORPORATION COUNSEL MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/08/1988ORDER SS, SCHED CASE FOR SETTLEMT ON 7/13/88 AT 10:00; GRANT MO OF APLE TO STAY. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 052788 SCHPRD N
06/09/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT THAT COURT SET THIS CASE FOR DECISION ON APPELLANT'S BRIEF ALONE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/15/1988APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APLT'S MOTION TO SET CASE RJG PANEL SCDATE 062088 SCHPRD OPE
06/27/1988ORDER DENYING APLT MO THAT THE CRT SET THIS CASE FOR DEC ON APLTS BRF ALONE. ACG PANELPY SCDATE 062788 SCHPRD CHECK
07/13/1988SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/19/1988ORDER SS, PARTIES TO APPEAR AT STATUS HEARING ON 8/31/88 AT 9:00 A.M. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1988ORDER BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 083188 SCHPRD MEMO
10/11/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 100688 SCHPRD BE
10/11/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/18/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE APPELLEE'S BRIEF, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO PROHIBIT ITS FILING JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/21/1988APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE RJG PANEL SCDATE 103188 SCHPRD OPE
11/17/1988FiledBriefing Completed
11/17/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1988ORDER DENY MO OF APLT TO STRIKE; GRANT MO OF APLE FOR LV TO FL BRFCLK TO FL & SCHED ASAP. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 102388 SCHPRD OPA
03/15/1989ORDER SS, SCHED FOR ARG ON 4/26/89 SUM CAL; MO TO DISMISS & OPPO HELD IN ABEY PENDG ARG. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 072189 SCHPRD CHECK
04/26/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/26/1989ARGUED PANELRGTERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/28/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF SUPERIOR COURT ORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S MOTION PANELRGTERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/28/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/18/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD