Case: 09-04-00504-CR
09-04-00504-CR
12/01/2004
Aggravated Sexual Assault
Shelacey Beck
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/15/2005 | Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk | | |||
11/15/2005 | Case stored | | |||
11/15/2005 | Mandate Issued | | |||
08/31/2005 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
08/24/2005 | Submitted | | |||
08/15/2005 | Exhibits Filed | | |||
08/09/2005 | Order Entered | | |||
08/03/2005 | 21 Day Submission | | |||
08/03/2005 | Case ready to be set | | |||
08/03/2005 | Brief Filed | | |||
06/27/2005 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/27/2005 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
06/02/2005 | Brief Filed | | |||
05/23/2005 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
05/23/2005 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
05/03/2005 | Reporters Record Filed | | |||
03/03/2005 | Order Entered | | |||
02/16/2005 | Supplemental Record Filed | | |||
01/20/2005 | Order Entered | | |||
01/19/2005 | Letter | | |||
01/14/2005 | Clerks Record Filed | | |||
12/16/2004 | Certificate Filed | | |||
12/15/2004 | Certificate Filed | | |||
12/01/2004 | No certification with Notice of Appeal Letter | | |||
12/01/2004 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/15/2005 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Clyde M. Herrington |
Beck, She'lacey | Appellant | William A. Agnew Jr. |
Trial Court Information
159th District Court
Angelina
Honorable Paul E. White
CR-24462
20 years