judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TEAL, GREGORY UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1342
Short Caption:TEAL, GREGORY UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Destruction Of Property
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M2567-86Filed Date:09/10/1986

Opening Event Date:09/10/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/15/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/05/1988
Argued/Submitted:01/26/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/21/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Jonathan S. ZuckerYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Thomas J. Tourish, Jr.YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TEAL, GREGORY UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/01/26 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - ZUCKERJ FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - TOURISHT FOR - APPELLEE
09/10/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/18/1986RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) GG PANEL SCDATE 110486 SCHPRD R
12/31/1986APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JONATHAN ZUCKER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/14/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (280 PGS - DAVIS) GG PANEL SCDATE 121886 SCHPRD RT
04/15/1987FiledRecord Completed
05/13/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 6TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 052687 SCHPRD BA
06/05/1987ORDER GRT MO ONLY TO THE EXTENT THAT APLT'S BR DUE IN 30 DAYS. TTC PANELPY SCDATE 051887 SCHPRD CHECK
07/07/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 5TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 070687 SCHPRD BA
08/07/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF PENDING PREPARTION OF TRAN- SCRIPT PB PANEL SCDATE 080587 SCHPRD BA
12/24/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (21 PGS - LEWIS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/11/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR & APLT BR DUE IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 081787 SCHPRD OPE
03/23/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/22/88 (NO OPE) GT (PB) PANEL SCDATE 032288 SCHPRD BA
04/29/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF LATE JB PANEL SCDATE 042288 SCHPRD BA
04/29/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO LV TO FL BRF; CLK TO FL BRF; APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELPY SCDATE 051688 SCHPRD V
06/20/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7/22/88 (NO OPE) GT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/5/88 (NO OPPO) GG PANEL SCDATE 072288 SCHPRD BE
07/28/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 8/5/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 072288 SCHPRD V
08/05/1988FiledBriefing Completed
08/05/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 080588 SCHPRD BE
08/15/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (19 PGS - DAVIS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/02/1988LETTER GRANT REQ OF APLT FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 1/25/89. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 121288 SCHPRD OPE
01/26/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/26/1989ARGUED PANELNWSTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWSTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/21/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD