judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COLLIER (STEVEN) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 34762
Short Caption:COLLIER (STEVEN) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR94P1483Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/07/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/01/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/01/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08226
10/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34429, 34579, 34587, 34683, 34696, 34700, 34713, 34762. 99-09651
12/07/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. Mailed on 12/02/99. 99-12247
12/07/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/11/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 01-00690
02/06/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-00769
02/06/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 7, 2001. 01-00769